Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CITY OF LAKE WORTH V DEVEAUX, ISRAEL F
On January 24, 2008 a real property/foreclosure case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 24, 2008
Last Refreshed
February 22, 2021
Filing Location
Palm Beach County, FL
Category
REAL PROPERTY/FORECLOSURE
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Judgment of Foreclosure
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
FINAL JUDGMENT FORECLOSURE BOOK 024526 PAGE 00162
Date: May 13, 2011MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: Apr 26, 2011COMPLAINT
Date: Jan 24, 2008Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS |
|
November 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE BOOK 24869 PAGE 1838 ISSUED TO CITY OF LAKE WORTH |
|
October 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of $103.40 was made on receipt CAMB607394. Filed by PLAINTIFF CITY OF LAKE WORTH |
|
October 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
FORECLOSURE FEES ADDED A Foreclosure Fees Payment of $103.40 was made on receipt CAMB607395. Filed by PLAINTIFF CITY OF LAKE WORTH |
|
October 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE SOLD TO PLAINTITFF FOR $6,200.00 |
|
October 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
BID SHEET INFORMATION SHEET ATTACHED |
|
October 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
FORECLOSURE SALE FEE ADDED Filed by PLAINTIFF CITY OF LAKE WORTH |
|
October 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$70.00 was made on receipt CAMB605987. Filed by PLAINTIFF CITY OF LAKE WORTH |
|
October 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE Filed by PLAINTIFF CITY OF LAKE WORTH |
|
September 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE 10/17/11 CITY OF LAKE WORTH VS ISRAEL F DEVEAUX Filed by PLAINTIFF CITY OF LAKE WORTH 10/17/2011 |
|
August 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER RESETTING 10/17/11 RESCHEDULED SALE DATE 10/17/11 DTD AUG 31ST 2011 HOY |
|
August 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON 8/31/11 @ 8:45 -- PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO VACATE AND RESET SALE DATE |
|
August 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO VACATE FORECLOSURE SALE, STOP THE ISSUANCE OFTHE CERTIFICATE OF SALE AND THE CERTIFICATE OF TITLE AND RESCHEDULE THE FORECLOSURE SALES Filed by PLAINTIFF CITY OF LAKE WORTH |
|
July 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of $78.20 was made on receipt CAMB578824. Filed by PLAINTIFF CITY OF LAKE WORTH |
|
July 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
FORECLOSURE FEES ADDED A Foreclosure Fees Payment of $78.20 was made on receipt CAMB578825. Filed by PLAINTIFF CITY OF LAKE WORTH |
|
June 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
BID SHEET INFORMATION SHEET ATTACHED |
|
June 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$70.00 was made on receipt CAMB572967. Filed by PLAINTIFF CITY OF LAKE WORTH |
|
June 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
FORECLOSURE SALE FEE ADDED Filed by PLAINTIFF CITY OF LAKE WORTH |
|
June 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE 6/27/11 CITY OF LAKE WORTH VS ISRAEL F DEVEAUX Filed by PLAINTIFF CITY OF LAKE WORTH 06/27/2011 |
|
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE 6/27/11 CITY OF LAKE WORTH VS ISREAL DEVEAUX 06/27/2011 |
|
May 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT FORECLOSURE BOOK 024526 PAGE 00162 451,143.21 SALE DATE 6/27/11 DTD MAY 11 2011 HOY Filed by PLAINTIFF CITY OF LAKE WORTH $451,143.21 Jun 27 2011 12:00AM May 11 2011 12:00AM 451,143.21 SALE DATE 6/27/11 DTD MAY 11 2011 HOY Filed by PLAINTIFF CITY OF LAKE WORTH |
|
May 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
DISPOSED BY JUDGE Associated to docket FJFC filed on 2011-05-13 |
|
April 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Filed by PLAINTIFF CITY OF LAKE WORTH |
|
April 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 5/11/11 845AM PLT MOTION FOR FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE |
|
December 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT Filed by DEFENDANT ISRAEL F DEVEAUX |
|
December 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT Filed by PLAINTIFF CITY OF LAKE WORTH |
|
October 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED 9-24-10 Filed by DEFENDANT ISRAEL F DEVEAUX |
|
September 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$10.00 was made on receipt CAMB459980. Filed by PLAINTIFF CITY OF LAKE WORTH |
|
September 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED ASM-10-005252 Filed by DEFENDANT ISRAEL F DEVEAUX |
|
August 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS, GRANTED. GARRISON. |
|
August 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF LOST ORIGINAL SUMMONS |
|
August 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 8/23/10 8:45 AM PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS FILED BY JEAN MARIE MIDDLETON |
|
May 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS Filed by PLAINTIFF CITY OF LAKE WORTH |
|
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT Filed by PLAINTIFF CITY OF LAKE WORTH |
|
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$4.00 was made on receipt CAMB193316. Filed by PLAINTIFF CITY OF LAKE WORTH |
|
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET Filed by PLAINTIFF CITY OF LAKE WORTH |
|
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event | ADDITIONAL COMMENTS | |
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
LIS PENDENS BOOK 022407 PAGE 01363 Filed by PLAINTIFF CITY OF LAKE WORTH |
|
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$4.00 was made on receipt CAMB193191. Filed by PLAINTIFF CITY OF LAKE WORTH |
|
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
CAFF Filed by PLAINTIFF CITY OF LAKE WORTH |
|
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event | PENDING | |
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
FEE/LIS PENDENS ($5.60) Filed by PLAINTIFF CITY OF LAKE WORTH |
|
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-014535 Filed by DEFENDANT ISRAEL F DEVEAUX |
|
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$261.60 was made on receipt CAMB193129. Filed by PLAINTIFF CITY OF LAKE WORTH |