Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
COUNTRYWIDE BANK FSB V OPERA, DANIELA
On January 11, 2008 a real property/foreclosure case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 11, 2008
Last Refreshed
February 22, 2021
Filing Location
Palm Beach County, FL
Category
REAL PROPERTY/FORECLOSURE
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BOOK 023822 PAGE 01367
Date: Apr 23, 2010ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 023064 PAGE 00646
Date: Jan 28, 2009ANSWER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: Feb 07, 2008COMPLAINT
Date: Jan 11, 2008Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BOOK 023822 PAGE 01367 OF ACTION |
|
April 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER Associated to docket NOVD filed on 2010-04-23 |
|
April 23, 2010 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET | |
January 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 023064 PAGE 00646 E GARRISON |
|
January 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE BANK FSB |
|
May 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY CHAPTER 7 CASE NO 08-15609-BKC-PGH Filed by DEFENDANT DANIELA OPERA |
|
February 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COMPLAINT Filed by DEFENDANT DARRAGH MOORE |
|
February 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Filed by DEFENDANT DARRAGH MOORE |
|
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED 1/16/08 Filed by DEFENDANT QUANTUM PARK PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC |
|
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED 1/16/08 Filed by DEFENDANT CANTERBURY AT QUANTUM VILLAGE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION |
|
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) NOT SERVED Filed by DEFENDANT JOHN DOE |
|
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED 1/16/08 Filed by DEFENDANT DARRAGH MOORE |
|
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED 01/16/08 Filed by DEFENDANT DANIELA OPERA |
|
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) NOT SERVED Filed by DEFENDANT JANE DOE |
|
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$8.60 was made on receipt CAMB193354. Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE BANK FSB |
|
January 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$259.00 was made on receipt CAMB191423. Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE BANK FSB |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE BANK FSB |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE BANK FSB |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-009161 Filed by DEFENDANT QUANTUM PARK PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-009162 Filed by DEFENDANT JOHN DOE |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-009160 Filed by DEFENDANT CANTERBURY AT QUANTUM VILLAGE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
LIS PENDENS BOOK 022389 PAGE 01219 Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE BANK FSB |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-009163 Filed by DEFENDANT JANE DOE |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-009159 Filed by DEFENDANT DARRAGH MOORE |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-009158 Filed by DEFENDANT DANIELA OPERA |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
ADDITIONAL COMMENTS ***ATTY SHORT $8.60*** Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE BANK FSB |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
PENDING Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE BANK FSB |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
FEE/LIS PENDENS ($5.60) Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE BANK FSB |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
CAFF Filed by PLAINTIFF COUNTRYWIDE BANK FSB |