Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE V FERREIRA, KELLY C
On January 11, 2008 a real property/foreclosure case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 11, 2008
Last Refreshed
February 22, 2021
Filing Location
Palm Beach County, FL
Category
REAL PROPERTY/FORECLOSURE
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
FINAL JUDGMENT FORECLOSURE
Date: Apr 23, 2010MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: Apr 10, 2008NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: Apr 10, 2008NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: Apr 10, 2008ANSWER
Date: Feb 11, 2008ANSWER
Date: Jan 30, 2008COMPLAINT
Date: Jan 11, 2008Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED 5/9/11 1021AM WRIT OF POSSESSION Filed by DEFENDANT KELLY C FERREIRA |
|
May 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO 217 2ND WAY WEST PALM BEACH FL. 33407 TO PLT..PBSO-KH WPO-11-002422 Filed by DEFENDANT KELLY C FERREIRA |
|
May 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$50.00 was made on receipt CAMB555161. |
|
May 02, 2011 | Docket Event | REOPEN | |
May 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF THE WRIT OF POSSESSION 5/2/11 @ 8:45 AM |
|
May 02, 2011 | Docket Event | REDISPOSED | |
May 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF Filed By ATTORNEY BART T HEFFERNAN |
|
May 02, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION THE CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT CORUT IS HEREBY AUTHORIZED TO ISSUE A WRIT OF POSSESSION JUDGE HOY 5/2/211 | |
May 02, 2011 | Docket Event | CAFF/REOPEN ($50.00) | |
May 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE |
|
November 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE BOOK 24181 PAGE 507 ISSUED TO S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE, |
|
November 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
FORECLOSURE FEES ADDED A Foreclosure Fees Payment of $397.40 was made on receipt CAMB486899. Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE |
|
November 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of $397.40 was made on receipt CAMB486898. Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE |
|
November 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS |
|
October 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Filed by ATTORNEY NIKOLAY SERGEEV KOLEV |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SALE FEE ADDED | |
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$70.00 was made on receipt CAMB454471. |
|
August 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
BID SHEET INFORMATION SHEET ATTACHED |
|
August 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE SOLD TO PLT FOR $48,200.00 |
|
August 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE |
|
April 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT FORECLOSURE $212,146.63 SALE DATE 8/23/10 DTD APR 23 2010 COLTON $212,146.63 Aug 23 2010 12:00AM Apr 23 2010 12:00AM $212,146.63 SALE DATE 8/23/10 DTD APR 23 2010 COLTON |
|
April 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET DJ |
|
April 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE 8/23/10 US BANK NA V KELLY C FERREIRA ET AL PUB PBDBR AUG 6 AND 13 2010 08/23/2010 |
|
April 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
DOR FORECLOSURE FORM AMENDED Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE |
|
April 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
RE-NOTICE OF HEARING 04-23-2010 Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE |
|
June 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLE ATTYS FEES Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE |
|
May 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS AS TO AMOUNTS DUE & OWING Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE |
|
December 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED AS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KELLY C. FERREIRA SERVED AS JOHN DOE - CLERK MUST HAVE FULL NAME OF UNKNOWN PARTY |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE |
|
April 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED AGAINST UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KELLY C FERREIRA SERVED AS JOHN DOE |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT AND CALEBE BANKS DE OLIVEIRA Filed by DEFENDANT KELLY C FERREIRA |
|
April 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE |
|
April 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL TENANT 1 2 3 4 Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE |
|
April 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING ORIG NOTE Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE |
|
April 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING Associated to docket NOVD filed on 2008-04-10 |
|
April 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AS TO COUNT II RE ESTABLISHMENT OF LOST NOTE Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE |
|
April 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE |
|
April 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED 1/16/08 Filed by DEFENDANT MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INCORPORATED |
|
March 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DEFAULT NOT APPLICABLE AS TO VILLAGE OF SANDALWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC- PLEADING WAS FILED |
|
March 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE |
|
March 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE |
|
March 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE |
|
February 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE THAT PLTF HAS RESPONDED TO DEFT MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEM, INCORPORATED, AS NOMINEE FOR HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES, DISCOVERY REQUEST Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE |
|
February 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT Filed by DEFENDANT MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INCORPORATED |
|
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) NOT SERVED Filed by DEFENDANT TENANT #2 |
|
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED 01/22/08 Filed by DEFENDANT CALEBE BANKS DE OLIVEIRA |
|
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED 01/22/08 Filed by DEFENDANT KELLY C FERREIRA |
|
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED 01/22/08 Filed by DEFENDANT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KELLY C FERREIRA |
|
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) NOT SERVED Filed by DEFENDANT TENANT # 1 |
|
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED 01/16/08 Filed by DEFENDANT VILLAGE OF SANDALWOOD LAKES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC |
|
January 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
ANSWER DEFT ASSOCIATIONS'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE Filed by DEFENDANT VILLAGE OF SANDALWOOD LAKES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC |
|
January 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$268.00 was made on receipt CAMB191158. Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-008774 Filed by DEFENDANT MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INCORPORATED |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-008773 Filed by DEFENDANT TENANT #2 |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-008771 Filed by DEFENDANT CALEBE BANKS DE OLIVEIRA |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-008770 Filed by DEFENDANT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KELLY C FERREIRA |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
LIS PENDENS BOOK 022387 PAGE 00543 Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-008772 Filed by DEFENDANT TENANT # 1 |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-008769 Filed by DEFENDANT KELLY C FERREIRA |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-008775 Filed by DEFENDANT VILLAGE OF SANDALWOOD LAKES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
ADDITIONAL COMMENTS Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
PENDING Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
CAFF Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
FEE/LIS PENDENS ($5.60) Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE |