Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
HALL, GEORGE R V TOBACCO INDUSTRI OF US
On January 11, 2008 a product liability case was filed by George R Hall, against Tobacco Industri Of Us, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 11, 2008
Last Refreshed
February 22, 2021
Filing Location
Palm Beach County, FL
Category
PRODUCT LIABILITY
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 023775 PAGE 00595
Date: Mar 29, 2010NOTICE
Date: Feb 02, 2010PETITION
Date: Jan 11, 2008COLLECTION AGREEM/PAYMENT PLAN
Date: Jan 11, 2008Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 28-OCT-10 |
|
March 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 023775 PAGE 00595 CLOSE FILE (D HAFELE) |
|
March 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET DAO HEARING (D HAFELE) |
|
March 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
DISPOSED AFTER OTHER Associated to docket FDS filed on 2010-03-29 |
|
February 16, 2010 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
February 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL |
|
September 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$46.85 was made on receipt CAMB241090. Filed by PETITIONER GEORGE R HALL |
|
July 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$46.83 was made on receipt CAMB226817. Filed by PETITIONER GEORGE R HALL |
|
May 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$46.83 was made on receipt CAMB215083. Filed by PETITIONER GEORGE R HALL |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$46.83 was made on receipt CAMB207026. Filed by PETITIONER GEORGE R HALL |
|
March 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$46.83 was made on receipt CAMB200591. Filed by PETITIONER GEORGE R HALL |
|
February 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$46.83 was made on receipt CAMB195591. Filed by PETITIONER GEORGE R HALL |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
PETITION Filed by PETITIONER GEORGE R HALL |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
COLLECTION AGREEM/PAYMENT PLAN CIVIL COLLECTION Filed by PETITIONER GEORGE R HALL |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event | PENDING | |
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
FEE/PAYMENT PLAN ($25.00) Filed by PETITIONER GEORGE R HALL |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
CAFF Filed by PETITIONER GEORGE R HALL |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET Filed by PETITIONER GEORGE R HALL |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
APPL AND AFF OF INDIGENCY FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS Filed by PETITIONER GEORGE R HALL |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event | ADDITIONAL COMMENTS |