Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ROBINSON, MARK V COLUCCIO, EVAN
On January 11, 2008 a contract & debt case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 11, 2008
Last Refreshed
February 22, 2021
Filing Location
Palm Beach County, FL
Category
CONTRACT & DEBT
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: Apr 07, 2008COMPLAINT
Date: Jan 11, 2008Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF PLTS, OF ACTION Filed by PLAINTIFF MARK ROBINSON |
|
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event | DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING | |
February 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT COPY MLD Filed by DEFENDANT EVAN COLUCCIO |
|
February 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DFT EVAN COLUCCIO Filed by PLAINTIFF MARK ROBINSON |
|
February 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE |
|
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED ON 1/14/08 Filed by DEFENDANT EVAN COLUCCIO |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT Filed by PLAINTIFF MARK ROBINSON |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
CAFF Filed by PLAINTIFF MARK ROBINSON |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$256.00 was made on receipt CAMB190996. Filed by PLAINTIFF MARK ROBINSON |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-008293 Filed by DEFENDANT EVAN COLUCCIO |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event | ADDITIONAL COMMENTS | |
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event | PENDING | |
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET Filed by PLAINTIFF MARK ROBINSON |