Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
WORLD SAVINGS BANK FSB V MARTINEZ, JOSE
On January 11, 2008 a real property/foreclosure case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 11, 2008
Last Refreshed
February 22, 2021
Filing Location
Palm Beach County, FL
Category
REAL PROPERTY/FORECLOSURE
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: Mar 18, 2009COMPLAINT
Date: Jan 11, 2008Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE Filed by PLAINTIFF WORLD SAVINGS BANK FSB |
|
March 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING Associated to docket NOVD filed on 2009-03-18 |
|
March 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS Filed by PLAINTIFF WORLD SAVINGS BANK FSB |
|
March 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT EVELYN ALVAREZ |
|
March 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED AGAINST JOSE MARTINEZ; MUST HAVE MLTRY STATUS |
|
March 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED AGAINST UNKNOWN TENANT #1 N/K/A EMILIO CASTILLO; MUST HAVE MLTRY STATUS |
|
February 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT Filed by PLAINTIFF WORLD SAVINGS BANK FSB |
|
February 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE Filed by PLAINTIFF WORLD SAVINGS BANK FSB |
|
January 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED 1/15/08 Filed by DEFENDANT UNKNOWN TENANT #1 |
|
January 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED 1/15/08 Filed by DEFENDANT EVELYN ALVAREZ |
|
January 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) NOT SERVED Filed by DEFENDANT UNKNOWN TENANT #2 |
|
January 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED 1/15/08 Filed by DEFENDANT JOSE MARTINEZ |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT Filed by PLAINTIFF WORLD SAVINGS BANK FSB |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-008032 Filed by DEFENDANT UNKNOWN TENANT #1 |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-008030 Filed by DEFENDANT JOSE MARTINEZ |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-008033 Filed by DEFENDANT UNKNOWN TENANT #2 |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-008031 Filed by DEFENDANT EVELYN ALVAREZ |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET Filed by PLAINTIFF WORLD SAVINGS BANK FSB |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
LIS PENDENS BOOK 022384 PAGE 00550 Filed by PLAINTIFF WORLD SAVINGS BANK FSB |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event | PENDING | |
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$261.60 was made on receipt CAMB190984. Filed by PLAINTIFF WORLD SAVINGS BANK FSB |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event | ADDITIONAL COMMENTS | |
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
CAFF Filed by PLAINTIFF WORLD SAVINGS BANK FSB |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
FEE/LIS PENDENS ($5.60) Filed by PLAINTIFF WORLD SAVINGS BANK FSB |