Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION V RUIZ, JUAN CARLOS
On January 11, 2008 a real property/foreclosure case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL. Judge Thomas H. Barkdull, III presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 11, 2008
Last Refreshed
February 22, 2021
Filing Location
Palm Beach County, FL
Category
REAL PROPERTY/FORECLOSURE
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
MOTION
Date: Aug 27, 2009ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 023423 PAGE 00815
Date: Aug 27, 2009MOTION
Date: Aug 27, 2009MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: Mar 31, 2008NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: Mar 31, 2008NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: Mar 31, 2008ANSWER
Date: Jan 29, 2008COMPLAINT
Date: Jan 11, 2008Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO VOLUNTARILY DISMISS CASE AND CANCEL NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION |
|
August 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 023423 PAGE 00815 DISMISSING CASE AND CANCELING NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS- AUGUST 27, 2009 JUDGE BARKDULL III *****ORIG DOCS RTND 09/02/09***** |
|
August 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
MOTION Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION |
|
August 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION |
|
August 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING Associated to docket ODIS filed on 2009-08-27 |
|
June 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF AMOUNTS DUE AND OWING Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION |
|
April 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT AND MERCEDES RUIZ Filed by DEFENDANT JUAN CARLOS RUIZ |
|
March 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION |
|
March 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING ORIG NOTE *****ORIG DOCS RTND 09/02/09 TO PLT ATTY PER ORDER 08/27/09**** Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION |
|
March 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION |
|
March 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION |
|
March 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL TENANT 1 2 3 4 Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION |
|
March 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AS TO COUNT II RE ESTABLISHMENT OF LOST NOTE Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION |
|
February 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) NOT SERVED Filed by DEFENDANT TENANT #2 |
|
February 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED 01/15/08 Filed by DEFENDANT WACHOVIA BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION |
|
February 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED 01/17/08 Filed by DEFENDANT JUAN CARLOS RUIZ |
|
February 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) NOT SERVED Filed by DEFENDANT TENANT # 1 |
|
February 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED 01/17/08 Filed by DEFENDANT MERCEDES RUIZ |
|
January 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT Filed by DEFENDANT WACHOVIA BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-007659 Filed by DEFENDANT WACHOVIA BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
LIS PENDENS BOOK 022381 PAGE 01396 Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-007660 Filed by DEFENDANT TENANT # 1 |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-007661 Filed by DEFENDANT TENANT #2 |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-007658 Filed by DEFENDANT MERCEDES RUIZ |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-007657 Filed by DEFENDANT JUAN CARLOS RUIZ |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$265.60 was made on receipt CAMB190831. Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
CAFF Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event | ADDITIONAL COMMENTS | |
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
FEE/LIS PENDENS ($5.60) Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event | PENDING |