Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK V SCHOCOFF, JACK
On December 31, 2007 a real property/foreclosure case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 31, 2007
Last Refreshed
September 08, 2023
Filing Location
Palm Beach County, FL
Category
REAL PROPERTY/FORECLOSURE
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Judgment of Foreclosure
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT II REESTABLISHMENT OF LOST NOTE
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a legal action filed by Washington Mutual Bank against the defendants Jack Schocoff, Golderiakes Villages Association, Inc., Bank of America N.A., and unknown parties in possession. The purpose of the action is to foreclose a mo…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
EXHIBIT
Date: Jun 03, 2008FINAL JUDGMENT FORECLOSURE BOOK 022698 PAGE 00976
Date: Jun 03, 2008REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: Mar 18, 2008ANSWER
Date: Mar 18, 2008MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: Feb 08, 2008COMPLAINT
Date: Dec 31, 2007Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS |
|
August 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE BOOK 22796 PAGE 1509 ISSUED TO THE PLAINTIFF |
|
July 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE Filed by PLAINTIFF WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK |
|
July 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
FORECLOSURE FEES ADDED A Foreclosure Fees Payment of $70.70 was made on receipt CAMB227946. Filed by PLAINTIFF WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK |
|
July 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
BID SHEET BANNER & LAPTOP RECEIPT ATT |
|
July 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE SOLD TO PLTF FOR $100.00 |
|
July 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of $70.70 was made on receipt CAMB227945. Filed by PLAINTIFF WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK |
|
June 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT TO JUDGMENT Filed by PLAINTIFF WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK |
|
June 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT FORECLOSURE BOOK 022698 PAGE 00976 $95 316.88 SALE DATE JULY 14 2008 DTD 6/2/08 COLBATH $316.88 Jul 14 2008 12:00AM Jun 2 2008 12:00AM $95 316.88 SALE DATE JULY 14 2008 DTD 6/2/08 COLBATH |
|
June 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE 7/14/08 WAMU VS JACK SCHOCOFF PUB PBDBR JUNE 23 AMD JUNE 30 2008 Filed by PLAINTIFF WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK 07/14/2008 |
|
June 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET DISPOSED BY JUDGE Filed by PLAINTIFF WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK |
|
June 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
DISPOSED BY JUDGE Associated to docket FJFC filed on 2008-06-03 |
|
June 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
DOR FORECLOSURE FORM AMENDED Filed by PLAINTIFF WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK |
|
May 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR FINAL/SUMMARY JUDGMENT Filed by PLAINTIFF WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK |
|
May 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT PLT COUNSEL Filed by PLAINTIFF WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK |
|
May 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS Filed by PLAINTIFF WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK |
|
May 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING PLT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND REQUEST FOR ATTY FEES JUNE 2, 2008 9:00 A.M. |
|
March 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF PUBLICATION Filed by PLAINTIFF WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK |
|
March 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE Filed by DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA NA |
|
March 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT Filed by DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA NA |
|
February 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Filed by PLAINTIFF WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK |
|
February 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY Filed by PLAINTIFF WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK |
|
February 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT Filed by PLAINTIFF WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK |
|
January 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED 1/3/08 Filed by DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA NA |
|
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT Filed by PLAINTIFF WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK |
|
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-002649 Filed by DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA NA |
|
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-002651 Filed by DEFENDANT UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2 |
|
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET Filed by PLAINTIFF WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK |
|
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-002650 Filed by DEFENDANT UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1 |
|
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-002648 Filed by DEFENDANT GOLDEN LAKES VILLAGE ASSOCIATION INC |
|
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-002647 Filed by DEFENDANT JACK SCHOCOFF |
|
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
LIS PENDENS BOOK 022361 PAGE 00243 Filed by PLAINTIFF WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK |
|
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$265.60 was made on receipt CAMB188980. Filed by PLAINTIFF WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK |
|
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event | PENDING | |
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
FEE/LIS PENDENS ($5.60) Filed by PLAINTIFF WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK |
|
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event | ADDITIONAL COMMENTS | |
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
CAFF Filed by PLAINTIFF WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK |