Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DYKES, NICHOLAS vs. HERNANDEZ, VICTOR
On March 20, 2023 an auto negligence case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. Judge YOUNG, TOM presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 20, 2023
Last Refreshed
August 19, 2023
Filing Location
Osceola County, FL
Judge
Hon. YOUNG, TOM
Category
CIRCUIT CIVIL
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2023030569 | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 03/20/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023 CA 001215 AN | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |