Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
EVERETT, CODY vs ROMERO HERCULES, SANTOS ISABEL
On December 19, 2017 a paternity case was filed by Everett, Cody, against Romero Hercules, Santos Isabel, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. Judge NETCHER, ERIC J presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 19, 2017
Last Refreshed
November 29, 2022
Filing Location
Osceola County, FL
Category
DOMESTIC RELATIONS
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $120.00 RECEIPT #2018051818 | |
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING THE MEDIATION AGREEMENT | |
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event | PROMISSORY NOTE FOR MEDIATION SERVICES | |
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
April 05, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FOR MEDIATION | |
April 05, 2018 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM ATTY TO JUDGE | |
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER ON REFERRAL AND REQUIREMENT TO ATTEND FAMILY MEDIATION | |
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FOR MEDIATION ON APRIL 20, 2018 | |
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION | |
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event | MEDIATION-FAMILY SET FOR 04/20/2018 AT 1:30 PM IN 1400 BEFORE JUDGE: Z BROWN, STEEN | |
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (SHORT FORM) FOR CODY EVERETT | |
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COUNTER -PETITION | |
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REFERRAL TO DISPUTE RESOLUTION SERVICES FROM THE CASE MANAGEMENT UNIT | |
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER | |
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING | |
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING | |
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event | UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT | |
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER | |
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO PETITION AND COUTERPETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND FOR RELATED RELIEF | |
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (SHORT FORM) FOR SANTOS HERCULES | |
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $300.00 RECEIPT #2017120441 | |
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 12/20/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 DR 005060 PA | |
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY) | |
December 19, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASES | |
December 19, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER FOR | |
December 19, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED | |
December 19, 2017 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES | |
December 19, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING | |
December 19, 2017 | Docket Event | PETITION FO DETERMINE PATERNITY, TIMESHARING/PARENTING PLAN AND CHILD SUPPORT | |
December 19, 2017 | Docket Event | UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT |