Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MEJIAS, FRANCISCO vs MEJIAS, BRIGIDA
On October 31, 2012 a dissolution of marriage case was filed by Mejias, Francisco, against Mejias, Brigida, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. Judge ARNOLD, C presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 31, 2012
Last Refreshed
November 29, 2022
Filing Location
Osceola County, FL
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Skipper, Linda;Judge
Hon. ARNOLD, C
Category
DOMESTIC RELATIONS
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Judgment of Divorce,Annulment,Separation
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE ON PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR $750 (FILED 5/2/2013) (REC) | |
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER ON R&R OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE ON PET'S MOTION FOR $750 (FILED 5/2/13) | |
February 27, 2014 | Docket Event | REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE ON RES'S MOTION FOR $750 (FILED 5/2/13) | |
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
January 22, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION HEARING SET FOR 02/21/2014 AT 8:30 AM IN 3203 BEFORE JUDGE: CLARK, JEFFREY B | |
January 16, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
January 14, 2014 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM CARMELINA MARIN TO JUDGE ARNOLD | |
January 14, 2014 | Docket Event | CONSENT TO WITHDRAWAL | |
January 14, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO WITHDRAW | |
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event | CONSENT TO WITHDRAWAL | |
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event | CONSENT TO WITHDRAWAL | |
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION HEARING SET FOR 01/09/2014 AT 8:30 AM IN 4D BEFORE JUDGE: ARNOLD, C JEFFERY | |
December 18, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING @ | |
December 18, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW | |
December 09, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION HEARING SET FOR 01/10/2014 AT 9:30 AM IN 3203 BEFORE JUDGE: SKIPPER, LINDA | |
December 04, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
October 16, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE DOMESTIC RELATIONS | |
August 27, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR CARMELINA MARIN, ESQ. | |
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR $750 | |
May 01, 2013 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT (REC) | |
April 30, 2013 | Docket Event | MISC PACKET FORMS DR ASSESSED $0.90 | |
April 30, 2013 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $0.90 RECEIPT #201313907 | |
April 18, 2013 | Docket Event | COPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE | |
April 18, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
April 18, 2013 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $8.00 RECEIPT #201312401 | |
April 18, 2013 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
April 18, 2013 | Docket Event | COPIES CIRCUIT CIVIL ASSESSED $6.00 | |
April 18, 2013 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF Dissolution of Marriage | |
April 18, 2013 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE CERTIFIED COPIES ASSESSED $2.00 | |
April 02, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING ON 4/18/13 @ 8:30AM 4D | |
April 02, 2013 | Docket Event | FINAL HEARING SET FOR 04/18/2013 AT 8:30 AM IN 4D BEFORE JUDGE: ARNOLD, C JEFFERY | |
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event | MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FOR Dissolution of Marriage | |
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event | MEDIATOR REPORT | |
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING MEDIATION AGREEMENT | |
March 11, 2013 | Docket Event | ||
March 11, 2013 | Docket Event | MEDIATOR REPORT | |
March 08, 2013 | Docket Event | MEDIATION FEE - INCOME <$50,000 FILING FEE ASSESSED $59.00 | |
March 08, 2013 | Docket Event | PAYMENT FOR MEDIATION FRANCISCO MEJIAS | |
March 08, 2013 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $60.00 RECEIPT #201308033 | |
March 08, 2013 | Docket Event | MEDIATION FEE - SERVICE CHARGE DR ASSESSED $1.00 | |
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event | .PAYMENT FOR MEDIATION BRIGIA MEJIAS (INDIGENT) | |
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event | .APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS | |
February 18, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL & REQUIREMENT TO ATTEND FAMILY MEDIATION | |
February 05, 2013 | Docket Event | MEDIATION-FAMILY SET FOR 03/08/2013 AT 1:30 PM IN 1400 BEFORE JUDGE: Z QUINONES, IV, JOHN P | |
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION | |
January 07, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE | |
January 07, 2013 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (SHORT FORM) FOR BRIGIDA MEJIAS | |
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REFERRAL TO DISPUTE RESOLUTION SERVICES FROM THE CASE MANAGEMENT UNIT | |
December 13, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE | |
December 13, 2012 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (SHORT FORM) FOR FRANCISCO MEJIAS | |
December 03, 2012 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 11/8/12 | |
December 03, 2012 | Docket Event | ANSWER Dissolution of Marriage | |
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 11/8/12 | |
November 19, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event | RECORDING FEE FOR F/J RECEIPT: 240110 DATE: 10/31/2012 | |
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event | DISSOLUTION FILING FEE RECEIPT: 240110 DATE: 10/31/2012 | |
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASES | |
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR Dissolution of Marriage | |
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RECEIPT: 240110 DATE: 10/31/2012 | |
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER IMPLEMENTING A STANDING TEMP ORDER FOR Dissolution of Marriage ACTIONS WITH OR WITHOUT MINOR CHILDREN, ORANGE & OSCEOLA COUNTIES | |
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITH THE COURT FILE |