Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
SEMINOLE CHIROPRACTIC CENTER vs. GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
On June 21, 2024 a sc - personal injury protection up to $100 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL. Judge K. Douglas Walker presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 21, 2024
Last Refreshed
June 26, 2024
Filing Location
Orange County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit
Judge
Category
SC - Personal Injury Protection up to $100
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Personal Injury
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Summons Issued Electronically as to
Date: Jun 24, 2024Notice of Service of Interrogatories
Date: Jun 21, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Electronically as to
Judge: K. Doug Walker |
|
June 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogatories
Judge: K. Doug Walker |