Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEM SUNBELT INC vs. GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY
On April 25, 2024 a sc - personal injury protection $501-2,500 case was filed by Adventist Health System Sunbelt Inc, represented by Robert Bartels, against Government Employees Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL. Judge Amanda S. Bova presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 25, 2024
Last Refreshed
May 01, 2024
Filing Location
Orange County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit
Category
SC - Personal Injury Protection $501-2,500
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Personal Injury
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Summons Issued Electronically as to
Date: Apr 26, 2024Correspondence
Date: Apr 25, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Electronically as to
Judge: Amanda S Bova |
|
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Electronically as to Comments: em atty
Judge: Amanda S Bova |
|
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Correspondence
Judge: Amanda S Bova |