Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
FERREIRA, CELIA R vs. MORETTI, MARCO A
On December 05, 2005 an annulment case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL. Judge Heather L Higbee presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 05, 2005
Last Refreshed
December 01, 2021
Filing Location
Orange County, FL
Category
Annulment
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Non-Jury Verdict
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Division
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
May 01, 2006 | hearing | Non-Jury Trial - Smith, Maura T | |
May 01, 2006 | hearing | Non-Jury Trial - Deactivated, Deactivated | |
May 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
HEARING - Non-Jury Trial - Deactivated, Deactivated
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
May 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
HEARING - Non-Jury Trial - Smith, Maura T
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
April 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
Court Minutes
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
April 06, 2006 | hearing | Status Hearing - Smith, Maura T | |
April 06, 2006 | hearing | Status Hearing - Deactivated, Deactivated | |
April 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Amended Final Judgment
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
April 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
HEARING - Status Hearing - Smith, Maura T
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
April 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
HEARING - Status Hearing - Deactivated, Deactivated
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
April 05, 2006 | hearing | Status Hearing - Smith, Maura T | |
April 05, 2006 | hearing | Status Hearing - Deactivated, Deactivated | |
April 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
HEARING - Status Hearing - Deactivated, Deactivated
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
April 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Disposed by Non-Jury Trial
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
April 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Final Judgment
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
April 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
April 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Disposition Sheet
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
April 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
HEARING - Status Hearing - Smith, Maura T
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
April 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
March 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
March 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
March 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice for Trial
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
March 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order for Non Jury Trial
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
March 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Letter
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
March 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
March 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice for Trial
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
March 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Answer
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
February 21, 2006 | hearing | Conversion Hearing - Smith, Maura T | |
February 21, 2006 | hearing | Conversion Hearing - Deactivated, Deactivated | |
February 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
HEARING - Conversion Hearing - Smith, Maura T
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
February 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
HEARING - Conversion Hearing - Deactivated, Deactivated
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
February 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Mediation Report
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
February 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Joint Stipulation
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
January 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
January 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Mediation Report
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
January 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Financial Affidavit
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
January 10, 2006 | hearing | Conversion Hearing - Smith, Maura T | |
January 10, 2006 | hearing | Conversion Hearing - Deactivated, Deactivated | |
January 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
HEARING - Conversion Hearing - Smith, Maura T
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
January 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
HEARING - Conversion Hearing - Deactivated, Deactivated
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
January 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Receipt
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
January 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
Receipt
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
December 20, 2005 | hearing | Status Hearing - Smith, Maura T | |
December 20, 2005 | hearing | Status Hearing - Thorpe, Janet C | |
December 20, 2005 | hearing | Status Hearing - Deactivated, Deactivated | |
December 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
HEARING - Status Hearing - Deactivated, Deactivated
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
December 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
HEARING - Status Hearing - Thorpe, Janet C
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
December 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order Granting
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
December 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
HEARING - Status Hearing - Smith, Maura T
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
December 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
December 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
December 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
December 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice Appearance of Counsel
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
December 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
Petition
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
December 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
Initial Judge Assigned
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
December 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of Social Security
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
December 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
Financial Affidavit
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
December 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Sheet
Judge: Heather L Higbee |
|
December 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued
Judge: Heather L Higbee |