Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
472022DR000428ASAXMX
A Domestic Relations/Family 16-E case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL. Judge BUCHANAN, LAURIE E presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 30, 2022
Last Refreshed
December 12, 2023
Filing Location
Okeechobee County, FL
Category
Domestic Relations/Family 16-E
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS (PROPOSED) | |
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT ORDER | |
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to REOPENED | |
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO RENEE TREVINO | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | LETTER TO THE CLERK (OA86) CLERK OF COURT ACTION REQUEST (CS-OA86) | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET (CS-ES15) | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | OA40 - FINAL ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT ORDER | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | INCOME DEDUCTION ORDER | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGE RE-ASSIGNED | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 472022DR000428ASAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/30/2022 | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTER TO THE CLERK (OA86) CLERK OF COURT ACTION REQUEST (CS-OA86) | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET (CS-ES15) | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PROCEEDING TO ESTABLISH ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT ORDER | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER |