Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ISIS CLARO VS AZEALIA BANKS
On June 04, 2024 an evictions - residential case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL. Judge SD 03 - South Dade 03 - Judge De La Rosa, Lissette presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 04, 2024
Last Refreshed
July 07, 2024
Filing Location
Miami-Dade County, FL
Judge
Hon. SD 03 - South Dade 03 - Judge De La Rosa, Lissette
Category
Evictions - Residential
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Landlord-Tenant
Status
Active
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I - EVICTION
COUNT II - BREACH OF LEASE (DAMAGES)
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a landlord's action to evict the tenant, Azealia Banks, from real property located in Miami-Dade County, Florida. The landlord alleges that the tenant has failed to pay rent as and when due, resulting in an indebtedness of $8,00…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Motion to Strike
Date: Jul 02, 2024Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Jul 01, 2024Answer and Counter Claim
Date: Jun 20, 2024Motion:
Date: Jun 20, 2024Complaint
Date: Jun 04, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion to Strike | |
July 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion for Extension of Time | |
June 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Parties: Banks Azealia |
|
June 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3200170 AMT PAID:$295.00 NAME:MCGRATH, GEORGE S. COLE, SCOTT & KISSANE, P.A. 110 S.E. 6TH STREET, S FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33301 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2103-CROSS CLAIM 1 $295.00 $295.00 TENDER TYPE:EFILINGS TENDER AMT:$295.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/21/2024 REGISTER#:320 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER |
|
June 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability/absence | |
June 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Answer and Counter Claim | |
June 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion: FOR DETERMINATION OF RENT TO BE DEPOSITED INTO THE COURT REGISTRY |
|
June 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Parties: Banks Azealia |
|
June 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:2450019 AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:VISA CARD TENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/11/2024 REGISTER#:245 CASHIER:E405496 |
|
June 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
20 Day Summons Issued Parties: Banks Azealia |
|
June 11, 2024 | Docket Event | 20 Day Summons Issued | |
June 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:2070019 AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:VISA CARD TENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/10/2024 REGISTER#:207 CASHIER:E405496 |
|
June 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Summons and Complaint Mailed Parties: Banks Azealia |
|
June 10, 2024 | Docket Event | 5 Day Summons Issued | |
June 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
5 Day Summons Issued Parties: Banks Azealia |
|
June 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3170028 AMT PAID:$185.00 NAME:CARRERO, RAYMOND, ESQ RAYMOND CARRERO PA 10625 N. KENDALL DRIVE MIAMI FL 33176 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE 1 $185.00 $185.00 TENDER TYPE:EFILINGS TENDER AMT:$185.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/08/2024 REGISTER#:317 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER |
|
June 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
June 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount |