Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
AMERICAN EXPRESS NATL BANK VS GISELLE LOPEZ
On October 14, 2021 a contract and indebtedness ($15,001 - $30,000) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 14, 2021
Last Refreshed
December 14, 2023
Filing Location
Miami-Dade County, FL
Category
Contract and Indebtedness ($15,001 - $30,000)
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Dismissal
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT II ACCOUNTS STATED Pursuant to F.R.C.P. Form 1.933, approved by the Florida Supreme Court
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed under Filing # 136562013 and was e-filed on October 14, 2021, at 01:24:52 PM. The text does not provide any information about the nature of the complaint or the parties involved. Therefore, it is not possible to summarize …...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Order of Dismissal
Date: Sep 07, 2022Stipulation
Date: Aug 25, 2022Response to Request for Production
Date: Jun 22, 2022Response to Request for Admissions
Date: Jun 22, 2022Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: Jun 16, 2022Order of Referral to Mediation Unit
Date: Jun 09, 2022Order Extending Time for
Date: May 18, 2022Request:
Date: Apr 13, 2022Answer and Affirmative Defense
Date: Feb 16, 2022Motion to Dismiss
Date: Feb 04, 2022Order Setting CM Deadline
Date: Jan 03, 2022Complaint
Date: Oct 14, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Compliance Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Lopez Giselle |
|
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:2620004 AMT PAID:$60.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2170-MEDIATOR FEE 1 $60.00 $60.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECK TENDER AMT:$60.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/23/2022 REGISTER#:262 CASHIER:BELKISG Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Admissions Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Answer to Interrogatories Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Referral to Mediation Unit 9/15/22 @ 2PM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Extending Time for TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request: Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice: OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of: Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default AND DEFAULT FINAL JUDMGMENT (PLTF'S) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Non-Military Affidavit Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit as to Costs Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Indebtedness Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Setting CM Deadline Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Lopez Giselle |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3000176 AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:SCOTT E MODLIN 1551 SAWGRASS CORPORATE PKWY STE 110 SUNRISE FL 33323-2832 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH TENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/28/2021 REGISTER#:300 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued RE: INDEX # 4. Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Lopez Giselle |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
20 Day Summons Issued Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3030215 AMT PAID:$400.00 NAME:SCOTT E MODLIN 1551 SAWGRASS CORPORATE PKWY STE 110 SUNRISE FL 33323-2832 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE 1 $400.00 $400.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH TENDER AMT:$400.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/16/2021 REGISTER#:303 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint $16901.08 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount Due Date: Complete Date: |