Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Green, Allan, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Piloto, Hilda, against Shechter And Everett, Llp, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 14, 2021 |
CategoryBusiness Transactions |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Complaint
Date: October 14, 2021(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received
Date: October 14, 2021Affidavit of Service
Date: December 07, 2021Amended Complaint
Date: May 12, 2022ESummons 20 Day Issued
Date: October 18, 2021Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount
Date: October 14, 2021Order Setting CM Deadline
Date: February 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Setting CM Deadline Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued RE: INDEX # 4. Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Shechter and Everett LLP |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
20 Day Summons Issued Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3040033 AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:PILOTO, HILDA 200 S BISCAYNE BLVD STE 3600 MIAMI FL 33131-2395 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH TENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/16/2021 REGISTER#:304 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3030243 AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:PILOTO, HILDA 200 S BISCAYNE BLVD STE 3600 MIAMI FL 33131-2395 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE 1 $401.00 $401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH TENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/15/2021 REGISTER#:303 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.