Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
NELSON LORENZO ET AL VS CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION
On October 14, 2021 a contract and indebtedness ($15,001 - $30,000) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 14, 2021
Last Refreshed
September 14, 2023
Filing Location
Miami-Dade County, FL
Category
Contract and Indebtedness ($15,001 - $30,000)
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Active
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I BREACH OF CONTRACT
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed in the County Court of the 11th Judicial Circuit in Miami-Dade County, Florida. The plaintiffs, Nelson Lorenzo and Esperanza Rodriguez Serrano, are suing Citizens Property Insurance Corporation for damages. The complaint s…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Complaint
Date: Oct 14, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: Oct 14, 2021Request for Production
Date: Oct 14, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3010146 AMT PAID:$400.00 NAME:LEO A MANZANILLA 770 PONCE DE LEON BLVD STE 101 CORAL GABLES FL 33134-2066 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE 1 $400.00 $400.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH TENDER AMT:$400.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/15/2021 REGISTER#:301 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Email Notice: EMAIL ADDRESS: Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatory Due Date: Complete Date: |