Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
GARY RODZEWICZ VS JONATHAN O. MOLINA
On December 11, 2018 an auto negligence case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 11, 2018
Last Refreshed
October 06, 2023
Filing Location
Miami-Dade County, FL
Category
Auto Negligence
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Dismissal
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Gary Rodzewicz against Jonathan O. Molina in the Circuit Court of the 11th Judicial Circuit in Miami-Dade County, Florida. The complaint seeks damages in excess of the minimum jurisdictional limits of the court. The acc…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Voluntary Dismissal
Date: Jan 03, 2019Request for Production
Date: Dec 11, 2018Complaint
Date: Dec 11, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Molina Jonathan O. |
|
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
20 Day Summons Issued Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Molina Jonathan O. |
|
December 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3490212 AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:WILLIAM A DEAN 2875 NE 191ST ST STE 600 AVENTURA FL 33180-2833 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH TENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/14/2018 REGISTER#:349 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3420129 AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:WILLIAM A DEAN 2875 NE 191ST ST STE 600 AVENTURA FL 33180-2833 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE 1 $401.00 $401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH TENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/13/2018 REGISTER#:342 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatory Due Date: Complete Date: |