Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CELEBRITY REHAB AND MEDICAL CENTER., VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
On February 05, 2018 a personal injury protection ($8,001 - $15,000) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 05, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 13, 2023
Filing Location
Miami-Dade County, FL
Category
Personal Injury Protection ($8,001 - $15,000)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Personal Injury
Status
Dismissal
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Celebrity Rehab and Medical Center on behalf of Jorge Cambas Sanchez against Progressive American Insurance Company. The complaint alleges that there was a policy of automobile insurance in effect, issued by Progressive…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Voluntary Dismissal
Date: Mar 06, 2018Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure
Date: Feb 27, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: Feb 05, 2018Complaint
Date: Feb 05, 2018Request for Production
Date: Feb 05, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice: Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3530020 AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:IGLESIA, JOSE R 7154 SW 47TH ST STE B FL 2 MIAMI FL 33155-4664 ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH TENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DA Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
20 Day Summons Issued Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3480010 AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:IGLESIA, JOSE R 7154 SW 47TH ST STE B FL 2 MIAMI FL 33155-4664 ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE 1 $300.00 $300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH TENDER AMT:$300.00 RECEIPT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatory Due Date: Complete Date: |