Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
PNMAC MORTGAGE OPPORTUNITY FUND (ETC) VS PATINO, JULIO C
On December 08, 2011 a rpmf -homestead ($250,000 or more) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 08, 2011
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Miami-Dade County, FL
Category
RPMF -Homestead ($250,000 or more)
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Bankruptcy
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order to Vacate Judgment DISMISS CASE, DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS, RELEASE ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Citibank Fed Svgings Bank; Patino Julio C; Molina Maria Fernanda; Costa Bella Assn Inc; Citibank (na); Age Of Empire Inc |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion: TO DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS, VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Case Pending Bankruptcy Stay 1515818- RAM - (JULIO C. PATINO) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Bankruptcy JULIO C PATINO 15-15818-RAM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Publication Fee SALE DATE: 04/07/2015 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Sale 04/07/2015 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Resetting Foreclosure Sale TO 04/07/15 AND 1/06/15 SALE IS CANCELLED Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Sale Date MTGE FORECLSU 04/07/2015 09:00 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Sale Cancelled 01/06/2015 09:00 AM CANCELLED PER COURT ORDER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
No Further Judicial Action FINAL NFC / NO FURTHER CANCELLATIONS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- MOTIONS 01/06/2015 08:30 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Publication Fee 195.00 SALE DATE OF 01/06/2015 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion: TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- MOTIONS 12/30/2014 08:30 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Sale Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Admissions Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Sale Date MTGE FORECLSU 01/06/2015 09:00 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Text VERIFIED STATEMENT OF PLNTF. COSTS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Text VERIFIED STATEMENT OF ATTNY. FEES. Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Document Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: ORIGINAL NOTE AND COPY OF MORTGAGE Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Final Judgment J $ 350938.28 BK:29296 PG:4614 CONSENT Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Patino Julio C; Molina Maria Fernanda; Costa Bella Assn Inc; Citibank (na); Age Of Empire Inc |
|
September 03, 2014 | hearing |
Final Judgment by Judge J $ 350938.28 BK:29296 PG:4614 CONSENT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Stipulation CONSENT TO FINAL JUDGMNT OF MRTG FORECLOSURE Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Admissions Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion: EFILED Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order: FOR EXT. OF TIME IS GRANTED. Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Non-Military Affidavit Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Non-Jury Trial 09/03/2014 07:00 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- MOTIONS 08/19/2014 08:30 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Witness List Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Pnmac Mortgage Opportunity Fund (etc) |
|
June 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Non-Jury Trial 08/18/2014 09:00 AM CAL CALL 08/01/14 AT 11:00 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: INTERROGATORIES Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Trial (case at Issue) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order of Default Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Molina Maria Fernanda |
|
May 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Non-Military Affidavit Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Default Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Citibank (na); Age Of Empire Inc |
|
March 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal Of Unknown Parties Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Non-Military Affidavit Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order on Motion to Strike Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- MOTIONS 09/18/2013 08:30 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion to Dismiss Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: UPDATED SERVICE LIST Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- MOTIONS 05/30/2013 08:30 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense ATTORNEY:00058704 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Patino Julio C |
|
September 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Email Notice: CASEMAIL@VGVLAW.COM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Response: TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss DEF. JULIO C. PATINO Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: CERTIFICATION REGARDING ATTENDANCE THORUGH COMMUNIC.EQUI Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of: RTD OF SERV W/O SUMMS,MARIA F MOLINA,SERV 12/22/11 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Mediators Report Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Lost Instrument Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice: THAT PLT COUNSEL WILL APPEAR THRU USE OF ETC... Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: NOTICE THAT PLT COUNSEL WILL APPEAR THRU USE OF ETC... Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice: OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Service Returned BADGE # 1607 P 01/09/2012 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Age Of Empire Inc |
|
January 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request: TO PARTICIPATE IN RMFM PROGRAM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Service Return for Unknown Party Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Service Returned BADGE # 1683 P 12/22/2011 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Patino Julio C |
|
December 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer ATTORNEY:00027020 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Costa Bella Assn Inc |
|
December 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Service Returned BADGE # 886 S 12/09/2011 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Citibank (na) |
|
December 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Service Returned BADGE # 1464 S 12/12/2011 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Costa Bella Assn Inc |
|
December 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Lis Pendens B: 27930 P: 0622 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Complaint Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee For Mortgage Foreclosure $ 1906.00 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Patino Julio C; Molina Maria Fernanda; Costa Bella Assn Inc; Citibank (na); Age Of Empire Inc |
|
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Certificate Regarding Original Note Due Date: Complete Date: |