Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
GUILLEN, CIRILO SOSA VS CARNIVAL CORPORATION
On December 29, 2010 an other negligence case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 29, 2010
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Miami-Dade County, FL
Category
Other Negligence
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
General Negligence
Status
Removal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2011 | hearing |
Notice of Removal to Federal Court B: 27608 P: 0158 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Removal to Federal Court B: 27608 P: 0158 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Carnival Corporation |
|
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice: OF UNAVAILABILITY Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Service Returned BADGE # 1320 P 01/05/2011 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Carnival Corporation |
|
December 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Demand for Jury Trial Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Carnival Corporation |
|
December 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatory Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |