Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON (THE) VS ROGERSON, PAUL
On May 20, 2010 a rpmf -non-homestead ($250,000 or more) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 20, 2010
Last Refreshed
February 20, 2021
Filing Location
Miami-Dade County, FL
Category
RPMF -Non-Homestead ($250,000 or more)
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal B: 27479 P: 0438 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
FILE:application/octet-stream;0;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/6bb482b3-e938-48ea-9fd5-2ac38d64d7a0/runs/227f8ddf-c8ee-48d0-8298-0c8576101db6/executions/6d3198dc-24b0-40bd-af85-0f23e3a64135/results/08ba33ad-d882-4e81-8e0f-c951775a5edb/lines/06ae7d92-925c-4195-90ee-58094fea1ada/Doc Discharge/release of Lis Pendens B: 27479 P: 0438 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Document Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
FILE:application/octet-stream;0;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/6bb482b3-e938-48ea-9fd5-2ac38d64d7a0/runs/227f8ddf-c8ee-48d0-8298-0c8576101db6/executions/6d3198dc-24b0-40bd-af85-0f23e3a64135/results/08ba33ad-d882-4e81-8e0f-c951775a5edb/lines/06ae7d92-925c-4195-90ee-58094fea1ada/Doc Voluntary Dismissal B: 27479 P: 0438 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Rogerson Paul; Magid Joseph; Mortgage Elect Reg Sys Inc; Courvoisier Courts Condo Assn Inc; Brickell Key Master Assn Inc |
|
October 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Service Return for Unknown Party Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Diligent Search Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Service Returned BADGE # 888888 P 05/29/2010 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Magid Joseph |
|
October 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned - No Service Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Rogerson Paul |
|
July 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Reply to Affirmative Defenses Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication PUB DATE : Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Diligent Search Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: ORIGINAL OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY ETC.. Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Entered Or Duplicated In Error TEXT ENTERED OR DUPLICATED IN ERROR Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Diligent Search Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Action - Publication PUB DATE :08/20/2010 1 COPY OF NOTICE & COMPLIANT MAILED Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Rogerson Paul |
|
July 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense ATTORNEY:00397490 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Brickell Key Master Assn Inc |
|
June 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense ATTORNEY:00894249 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Courvoisier Courts Condo Assn Inc |
|
June 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Pn's Cert of Residential Mortgage Foreclosure Case Status Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
FILE:application/octet-stream;0;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/6bb482b3-e938-48ea-9fd5-2ac38d64d7a0/runs/227f8ddf-c8ee-48d0-8298-0c8576101db6/executions/6d3198dc-24b0-40bd-af85-0f23e3a64135/results/08ba33ad-d882-4e81-8e0f-c951775a5edb/lines/72cf48c6-c3ac-4e4b-8f8f-7cf4e25fc9dd/Doc Lis Pendens B: 27296 P: 0553 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee For Mortgage Foreclosure $ 1906.00 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Rogerson Paul; Magid Joseph; Mortgage Elect Reg Sys Inc; Courvoisier Courts Condo Assn Inc; Brickell Key Master Assn Inc |