Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
KINGSWAY AMIGO INSURANCE CO VS MALDONADO, ADRIANA
On May 10, 2010 a declaratory judgment case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 10, 2010
Last Refreshed
February 20, 2021
Filing Location
Miami-Dade County, FL
Category
Declaratory Judgment
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal B: 27996 P: 2643 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE:application/octet-stream;0;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/6bb482b3-e938-48ea-9fd5-2ac38d64d7a0/runs/227f8ddf-c8ee-48d0-8298-0c8576101db6/executions/bc00e47d-a827-4113-b834-b50ca4f01ba0/results/3d1fdda7-460a-4e62-a082-a7575d326bcf/lines/07dbb27b-05ad-458c-845f-ea597d02b340/Doc Order of Dismissal B: 27996 P: 2643 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Maldonado Adriana; Perez Gonzalo; Ere Property Mgmt Inc; Espinoza Leandro (p E) |
|
June 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Unavailability/absence Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice: OF ANSWERS TO 2ND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES INTERROGATORIES Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Answer to Interrogatories Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Answer to Interrogatories Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatory Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Default Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Ere Property Mgmt Inc |
|
July 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Answer ATTORNEY:88888888 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Perez Gonzalo |
|
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Service Returned BADGE # 788 P 06/14/2010 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Perez Gonzalo |
|
June 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
Service Returned BADGE # 788 S 05/18/2010 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Espinoza Leandro (p E) |
|
May 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Answer ATTORNEY:88888888 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Espinoza Leandro (p E) |
|
May 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Demand for Jury Trial Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Maldonado Adriana; Perez Gonzalo; Ere Property Mgmt Inc; Espinoza Leandro (p E) |
|
May 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Due Date: Complete Date: |