Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
NATIONSTAR MORT (LLC) VS CAMACHO, ARNOLDO
On May 05, 2010 a rpmf -homestead ($250,000 or more) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 05, 2010
Last Refreshed
February 20, 2021
Filing Location
Miami-Dade County, FL
Category
RPMF -Homestead ($250,000 or more)
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Non-Jury Verdict
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Returned BADGE # 3771 S (UNEXECUTED) Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Camacho Arnoldo |
|
December 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Issued SHERIFF W/CK$115.00#22997/ORDER Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Camacho Arnoldo |
|
October 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE:application/octet-stream;0;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/6bb482b3-e938-48ea-9fd5-2ac38d64d7a0/runs/227f8ddf-c8ee-48d0-8298-0c8576101db6/executions/e4062962-a2f6-42dc-9cf3-26be70c615e7/results/e6bdd7a7-2dfb-4e83-98cb-48ad88762934/lines/423d3876-83f6-47c4-b075-8cae32c0f0b9/Doc Order for Writ of Possession B: 28333 P: 4046 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion for Writ of Possession ATY:00085356 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Set- MOTIONS 10/23/2012 10:30AM LS:01/30 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Email Notice: JSABET@ERWLAW.COM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Objection to Sale Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE:application/octet-stream;0;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/6bb482b3-e938-48ea-9fd5-2ac38d64d7a0/runs/227f8ddf-c8ee-48d0-8298-0c8576101db6/executions/e4062962-a2f6-42dc-9cf3-26be70c615e7/results/e6bdd7a7-2dfb-4e83-98cb-48ad88762934/lines/1c26ba65-4119-47ee-96bf-b69cab99f2ea/Doc Certificate of Title B: 28278 P: 4075 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Voucher Issued $ 619.20 DOC STAMPS/NF Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Disbursement (plaintiff) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Sale Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Bid Amount $103,200.00/PL/5073 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Deposit $ 619.20 PL/DOC STAMPS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Publication Fee 165.00 FOR SALE DATE OF 9/4/12 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Sale Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Set- MOTIONS 08/23/2012 10:30AM LS:01/30 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Affidavit as to Costs Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Affidavit as to Attorney Fees Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Non-Military Affidavit Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Indebtedness Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Collection Fee 70.00 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Document Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE:application/octet-stream;0;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/6bb482b3-e938-48ea-9fd5-2ac38d64d7a0/runs/227f8ddf-c8ee-48d0-8298-0c8576101db6/executions/e4062962-a2f6-42dc-9cf3-26be70c615e7/results/e6bdd7a7-2dfb-4e83-98cb-48ad88762934/lines/36862690-f3b6-4642-84d2-8ea6a63eb159/Doc Final Judgment N $ 370332.01 BK:28203 PG:4332 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Mesleidy Mato; Village At West Miami Condo (the) Etc |
|
July 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Sale Date MTGE FORECLSU 09/04/2012 09:00 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List EXHIBITS KEPT IN COURT FILE Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Final Judgment by Non Jury Trial N $ 370332.01 BK:28203 PG:4332 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Not Processed, Cal Full 07/17/2012 10:30 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Text WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Non-Jury Trial Courtroom 22A 07/24/2012 08:45 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Jury Trial Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Affidavit as to Costs Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: COPY OF AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Affidavit as to Attorney Fees Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion for Final Judgment Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Text CALENDAR CANCELLED PER JUDGE 06/28/12 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Default Not Entered AMENDED SVC/RTN FILED, REQ. DECISION BY THE COURT Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Mesleidy Mato |
|
April 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Text AMENDED RETURN OF SERVICE FOR DN02. PS #1127 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: NON MILITARY SERVICE AFFIDAVIT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Non-Military Affidavit Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Service Returned BADGE # 1127 P 02/02/2012 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Mesleidy Mato |
|
February 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Service Returned BADGE # 1127 P 02/02/2012 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Mesleidy Mato |
|
February 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense ATTORNEY:00545791 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Village At West Miami Condo (the) Etc |
|
February 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
Cross Claim 0.00 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order: AGREED ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion for Substitution of Counsel Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
FILE:application/octet-stream;0;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/6bb482b3-e938-48ea-9fd5-2ac38d64d7a0/runs/227f8ddf-c8ee-48d0-8298-0c8576101db6/executions/e4062962-a2f6-42dc-9cf3-26be70c615e7/results/e6bdd7a7-2dfb-4e83-98cb-48ad88762934/lines/cafc741a-3ce7-4e6f-95b1-152e65873314/Doc Suggestion of Bankruptcy B: 27579 P: 0698 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Camacho Arnoldo |
|
February 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Suggestion of Bankruptcy B: 27579 P: 0698 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Text AM.RTN OF SVC ON THE VILLAGE W.MIA....W/O SUMM.-SVD 5/7 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Indebtedness Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: AFFIDAVIT AS TO INDEBTEDNESS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Default Not Entered TYPE OF SVC NOT INDICATED ON SVC-AMEND-SUB TO JUDGE Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Village At West Miami Condo (the) Etc |
|
August 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Default Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Camacho Arnoldo; Mesleidy Mato |
|
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: AFFIDAVIL OF TIME, EFFORT AND COSTS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice: CHANGE OF COUNSEL OF RECORD Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Default Not Entered I(PLEASE SUBMIT COPY OF SIGNED SERVICE) Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Camacho Arnoldo; Mesleidy Mato; Village At West Miami Condo (the) Etc |
|
June 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice: OF BORROWER NONPARTICIPANT WITH RMFM PROGRAM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Non-Military Affidavit Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion: FOR SUMM FINAL JUDGMTN OF FORECLOSURE Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dropping Party UNK TENANT 1 & 2 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Service Return for Unknown Party Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Service Returned BADGE # 245 P 05/07/2010 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Village At West Miami Condo (the) Etc |
|
May 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
FILE:application/octet-stream;0;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/6bb482b3-e938-48ea-9fd5-2ac38d64d7a0/runs/227f8ddf-c8ee-48d0-8298-0c8576101db6/executions/e4062962-a2f6-42dc-9cf3-26be70c615e7/results/e6bdd7a7-2dfb-4e83-98cb-48ad88762934/lines/a3120b1b-14b9-477f-badf-2d5a6572487f/Doc Lis Pendens B: 27277 P: 2772 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Camacho Arnoldo; Mesleidy Mato; Village At West Miami Condo (the) Etc |
|
May 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Text CERT OF PLAIN COUNSEL REG ORIG NOTE 7 MORT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee For Mortgage Foreclosure $ 1906.00 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Due Date: Complete Date: |