Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
LAO, GLORIA VS SOUTHERN OAK INS CO
On November 26, 2008 contract & indebtedness case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 26, 2008
Last Refreshed
September 14, 2023
Filing Location
Miami-Dade County, FL
Category
Contract & Indebtedness
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Order of Dismissal
Date: Sep 09, 2009Recorded Document
Date: Sep 04, 2009Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal B: 27014 P: 3836 JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Southern Oak Ins Co |
|
September 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal B: 27014 P: 3836 JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Recorded Document B: 27026 P: 0377 JOINT STIP. FOR FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJ. Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Jury Trial 02/08/2010 09:00 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice: OF MEDIATION RESULT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Text PLTF'S WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appt of Medtrandcnfrnce 07/01/2009 01:00 PM MARKEL ARRIZABALAGA Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Answer to Interrogatories Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice: MEDIATION Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Returned Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Returned Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Response: TO MTN TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQ FOR PRODUCTION Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion for Protective Order Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
Multiple Notice of Taking Depositions Filed 2 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatory Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amended Answer ATTORNEY:00117935 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Southern Oak Ins Co |
|
April 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Answer to Interrogatories Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Not Timely Filed 04/27/2009 09:00 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Not Processed, Cal Full 05/20/2009 09:00 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Not Processed, Cal Full 05/20/2009 09:00 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Set- MOTIONS 05/20/2009 09:00AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Not Processed, Cal Full 04/27/2009 09:00 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Response: TO PLTFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order on Motion to Strike Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
Response: TO PLTFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice: OF MEDIATION Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatory Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Set- MOTIONS 04/06/2009 09:00AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Not Timely Filed 02/18/2009 09:00 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Jury Trial Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Not Processed, Cal Full 02/18/2009 09:00 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order of Referral to Mediation Unit Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Jury Trial 08/24/2009 09:00 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Jury Trial Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Not Processed, Cal Full 01/26/2009 09:00 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense ATTORNEY:00117935 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Southern Oak Ins Co |
|
December 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Demand for Jury Trial Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Southern Oak Ins Co |
|
November 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Complaint Due Date: Complete Date: |