Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC vs D R Horton Inc et al
A Circuit Civil 37-D case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL. Judge SANDERS, GARY LAMAR presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 19, 2022
Last Refreshed
July 03, 2023
Filing Location
Marion County, FL
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: Sep 22, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: Sep 21, 2022EFILED SUMMONS
Date: Sep 21, 2022CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: Sep 19, 2022PETITION/COMPLAINT
Date: Sep 19, 2022EFILED LIS PENDENS
Date: Sep 19, 2022RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM
Date: Sep 19, 2022EFILED SUMMONS
Date: Sep 19, 2022NOTICE OF FILING
Date: Sep 19, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | EFILED SUMMONS | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00 | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $10.00 Receipt Number XX 782883 | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $1,967.50 Receipt Number XX 782228 | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION/COMPLAINT | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | EFILED LIS PENDENS | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | EFILED SUMMONS | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 422022CA001954CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 9/19/2022 | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $1,967.50 | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Filer Selected Confidentiality Flag: . NoConfidentialInformation |