Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING L vs WEBER, R
On November 12, 2019 an other civil-business transactions case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL. Judge SANDERS, GARY LAMAR presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 12, 2019
Last Refreshed
September 07, 2023
Filing Location
Marion County, FL
Category
Circuit Civil 3-D
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
General Commercial
Status
Settlement
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is an application for court approval of a transfer of structured settlement payment rights. The applicant, Peachtree Settlement Funding, LLC, is seeking approval to purchase certain periodic payments from R. Weber in exchange for a…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: Jan 09, 2020PETITION/COMPLAINT
Date: Nov 12, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: Nov 12, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | CLS: FINAL ORDER GRANTING APPROVAL FOR TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS | |
January 20, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ATTACHED AFFIDAVIT FILED BY BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY | |
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event | PETITION/COMPLAINT | |
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Case 422019CA002483CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 11/12/2019 | |
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number XX 482644 | |
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 |