Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Merkel, Neysha MaryLouise Petitioner vs Hrebin, Eugene Paul, Jr. Respondent
On July 25, 2016 an uifsa iv-d - (uniform interstate family support act) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL. Judge Lisa S Porter presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 25, 2016
Last Refreshed
November 18, 2021
Filing Location
Lee County, FL
Category
UIFSA IV-D - (Uniform Interstate Family Support Act)
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Child Support
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Termination of IV-D Services | |
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Recommended Order By Hearing Officer | |
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Order on Contempt | |
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Bodily Attachment Issued copy to LCSO | |
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion for Contempt and Notice of Hearing | |
April 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk of Court Action Request | |
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Bodily Attachment Returned Served | |
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of Completion/Compliance | |
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Order at First Appearance | |
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Order on Contempt | |
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Bodily Attachment Issued copy to LCSO | |
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Recommended Order By Hearing Officer | |
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion for Contempt and Notice of Hearing | |
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Order at First Appearance | |
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Bodily Attachment Returned Served | |
July 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Recommended Order By Hearing Officer | |
July 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ of Bodily Attachment Issued copy to LCSO | |
July 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Order on Contempt | |
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion for Contempt and Notice of Hearing | |
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Purge payment | |
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Order on Contempt | |
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Writ of Bodily Attachment Issued copy to LCSO | |
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Recommended Order By Hearing Officer | |
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion for Contempt and Notice of Hearing11/10/16 @ 9:45 am | |
August 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Returned Mail | |
July 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Social Security Number (Secured) | |
July 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Requestto Register | |
July 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Order of Support | |
July 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Registration of Foreign Support Order | |
July 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Registration Statement | |
July 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Demographic Information Sheet by DOR |