Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Aurora Loan Services LLC Plaintiff vs Gonzalez, Alberto etal Defendant
On December 10, 2007 a ca mortgage foreclosure case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 10, 2007
Last Refreshed
September 07, 2023
Filing Location
Lee County, FL
Category
CA Mortgage Foreclosure
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Closed
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT II MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint was filed by Aurora Loan Services, LLC against Alberto Gonzalez, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. as nominee for First Magnus Financial Corporation, Unknown Tenant No. 1, Unknown Tenant No. 2, and all unknown parties …...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Assignment of Bid
Date: Aug 08, 2008Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: Apr 25, 2008Complaint
Date: Dec 10, 2007Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2008 | Docket Event | Returned Mail | |
August 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursements Issued | |
August 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title Issued | |
August 19, 2008 | hearing | ||
August 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Assignment of Bid | |
August 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Interest and Costs | |
August 07, 2008 | hearing | ||
August 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet | |
August 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale Issuedwent back to the pltf for $100.00 | |
July 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication - Notice of Sale | |
July 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication - Notice of Sale | |
July 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Minutes | |
July 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Sale Issued, Copy to Cape Coral Breeze | |
July 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Final Judgment (Summary) | |
July 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Original Mortgage Document(s) | |
June 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing7-7-08 @ 11am | |
June 02, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion for Default and Default (Issued) | |
June 02, 2008 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Non-Military Service/Military Service | |
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication - Notice of Action | |
April 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion for Summary Judgment | |
April 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Non-Military Service/Military Service | |
April 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Indebtedness/Amount Due | |
April 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Attorneys Fees | |
April 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Costs and Attorneys Fees | |
April 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion for Default and Default (Issued) | |
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Lost Summons | |
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event | Gonzalez, Alberto - Alias Summons (20 day) IssuedS/F | |
March 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice of Action w/ Copy of Complaint Mailed | |
March 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Gonzalez, Alberto - Affidavit of Publication Forec | |
March 10, 2008 | Docket Event | Directions to Clerk | |
March 10, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Action | |
March 10, 2008 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Diligent Search | |
December 10, 2007 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
December 10, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice of Lis Pendens | |
December 10, 2007 | Docket Event | Unknown Tenant 2 - Summons (20 day) Issuedsf | |
December 10, 2007 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
December 10, 2007 | Docket Event | Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc - Sumsf | |
December 10, 2007 | Docket Event | Unknown Tenant 1 - Summons (20 day) Issuedsf |