Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Midcountry Bank etal Plaintiff vs Lopez, Catherine etal Defendant
On December 10, 2007 a ca mortgage foreclosure case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 10, 2007
Last Refreshed
September 07, 2023
Filing Location
Lee County, FL
Category
CA Mortgage Foreclosure
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Closed
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I ACTION ON NOTE V. DEFENDANT LOPEZ
COUNT II MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint was filed by MidCountry Bank against Catherine Lopez and Hansen Homes of South Florida, Inc. in the Circuit Court of the Twentieth Judicial Circuit in Lee County, Florida. MidCountry Bank is a Federal Savings Bank and is the curren…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Motion for Judgment
Date: Oct 21, 2008Assignment of Judgment
Date: Oct 21, 2008Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: Mar 26, 2008Complaint
Date: Dec 10, 2007Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Deficiency Judgment | |
March 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Minutes | |
March 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing3-30-09 at 9am | |
February 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Order Substituting Party | |
January 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion to Substitute Party | |
January 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Consent | |
October 21, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion for Judgment | |
October 21, 2008 | Docket Event | Assignment of Judgment | |
October 21, 2008 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
October 21, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Attached Documents | |
July 01, 2008 | hearing | ||
July 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursements Issued | |
July 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title Issued | |
June 19, 2008 | hearing | ||
June 19, 2008 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet | |
June 19, 2008 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale Issuedto pltf for $7,000.00 | |
June 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication - Notice of Sale | |
May 19, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Sale Issued, Copy to News-Press | |
May 19, 2008 | Docket Event | Final Judgment (Summary) | |
May 19, 2008 | Docket Event | Minutes | |
April 09, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing5-19-08 @ 1am | |
March 26, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion for Summary Judgment | |
March 26, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
March 26, 2008 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Amounts Due and Owing | |
March 26, 2008 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Attorneys Fees | |
March 26, 2008 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Costs | |
March 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Default Issued | |
March 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion for Default | |
January 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Default Issued | |
January 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion for Default | |
December 10, 2007 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
December 10, 2007 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
December 10, 2007 | Docket Event | Lopez, Catherine - Summons (20 day) Issued | |
December 10, 2007 | Docket Event | Hansen Homes of South Florida Inc - Summons (20 da | |
December 10, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice of Lis Pendens |