Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
STILES, TRAVIS ALLEN
On December 21, 2022 a formal administration case was filed by Stiles, Catherine R., in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL. Judge BAXLEY, JAMES R presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 21, 2022
Last Refreshed
October 11, 2023
Filing Location
Lake County, FL
Category
Probate/Guardianship
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
Guardianship,Conservatorship
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION- NOTICE TO CREDITORS | |
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO CREDITORS | |
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CLAIM FROM | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF CLAIM SENT MAILED TO ATTY SMITH 3.10.23 ML |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
PAID $6.00 ON RECEIPT 2801299, FULLY PAID $6.00 2801299 Fully Paid |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
COPY REQUEST CC SO W |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER DATED | |
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event | CHECKLIST FOR OPENING FORMAL ADMINISTRATION | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT DEPOSITED SELF PROVEN |
|
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER DATED | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
PAID $400.00 ON RECEIPT 2792925, FULLY PAID $400.00 2792925 Fully Paid |
|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE REGARDING ORIGINAL WILL | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | PAID FUNERAL BILL | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | DEATH CERTIFICATE | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | COPY OF LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE - DESIGNATION RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE |