Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
SUNDANCE RIDGE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC,
On October 31, 2022 a negligence-premises liability residential case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL. Judge SENIOR COVERAGE JUDGE 7, presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 31, 2022
Last Refreshed
October 11, 2023
Filing Location
Lake County, FL
Judge
Hon. SENIOR COVERAGE JUDGE 7,
Category
Circuit Civil
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Premises Liability
Status
Non-Jury Verdict
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
NOTICE
Date: Sep 08, 2023FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: Aug 28, 2023EVIDENCE INVENTORY DELIVERED TO EVIDENCE CLERK
Date: Jun 06, 2023ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT
Date: Jun 06, 2023MOTION
Date: Jun 06, 2023SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED
Date: Jun 01, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR
Date: May 26, 2023REQUEST
Date: May 05, 2023NOTICE THAT CAUSE IS AT ISSUE
Date: Feb 22, 2023RESPONSE
Date: Dec 21, 2022CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: Dec 15, 2022SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO HOBAN, HYUN S / 11/30/2022
Date: Dec 02, 2022SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO HOBAN, WILLIAM M / 11/30/2022
Date: Dec 02, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO HOBAN, HYUN S
Date: Nov 01, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO HOBAN, WILLIAM M
Date: Nov 01, 2022PAID 420.00 ON RECEIPT 2780283, FULLY PAID
Date: Nov 01, 2022SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: Oct 31, 2022CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: Oct 31, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: Oct 31, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TEMPORARY REASSIGNMENT WITHIN FIRM |
|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT $3,327.50 LET EXECUTION ISSUE AWARDED TO PLAINTIFF FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COURT COSTS |
|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
EVIDENCE INVENTORY DELIVERED TO EVIDENCE CLERK PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENCE FROM HEARING ON 06/06/2023/ EVIDENCE INVENTORY / STORED IN THE VAULT |
|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF EVIDENCE |
|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR THE COURT TO DENY JUDICIAL NOTICE WITH ATTACHED EXHIBIT B OF MOTION TO APPEAL, MOTION TO STAY, MOTION TO RECEIVE ALL TRANSCRIPTS AND ALL OF RESPONDENTS ORIGINAL EXHIBITS | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR 6/6/23 AT 9 AM |
|
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COURT TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE |
|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
JUDGE REASSIGNMENT PER ADMIN ORDER L-2022-36-A DATED APRIL 19, 2023 SINGELTARY, G RICHARD SENIOR COVERAGE JUDGE 7, Per Admin Order L-2022-36-A dated April 19, 2023 |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE THAT CAUSE IS AT ISSUE NON JURY TRIAL // ESTIMATED TO TAKE ONE-HALF (1/2) DAY // EMAILED JA ON 02/22/2023 |
|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONSE | |
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO HOBAN, HYUN S / 11/30/2022 HOBAN, HYUN S 11/30/2022 |
|
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO HOBAN, WILLIAM M / 11/30/2022 HOBAN, WILLIAM M 11/30/2022 |
|
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED TO HOBAN, HYUN S HOBAN, HYUN S |
|
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED TO HOBAN, WILLIAM M HOBAN, WILLIAM M |
|
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
PAID $420.00 ON RECEIPT 2780283, FULLY PAID $420.00 2780283 Fully Paid |
|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF |