Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
NEWREZ LLC DBA SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING vs BOWEN AKA LYNN M BOWEN, LYNN MARIE
On June 30, 2022 a non-homestead residential foreclosure $50,001-$249,999 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL. Judge BAXLEY, JAMES R presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 30, 2022
Last Refreshed
March 05, 2024
Filing Location
Lake County, FL
Category
Circuit Civil
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Judgment of Foreclosure
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
REFUND REQUEST ISSUED
Date: Oct 19, 2023ORDER
Date: Oct 17, 2023COVER LETTER DATED
Date: Oct 17, 2023REFUND REQUEST ISSUED
Date: Oct 11, 2023ORDER
Date: Oct 09, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR
Date: Sep 28, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR
Date: Sep 25, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR
Date: Sep 18, 2023REFUND REQUEST ISSUED
Date: Sep 06, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Date: Sep 01, 2023NOTICE OF FILING
Date: Aug 17, 2023MOTION
Date: Aug 17, 2023PAID 50.00 ON RECEIPT 2854399, FULLY PAID
Date: Jul 21, 2023MOTION
Date: Jul 21, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF
Date: Jul 20, 2023WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED POSTED
Date: Jul 12, 2023ORDER
Date: Jul 05, 2023WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED DELIVERED TO
Date: Jul 05, 2023MOTION
Date: Jun 29, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF
Date: Jun 29, 2023PROPOSED DOCUMENT
Date: Jun 29, 2023CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO
Date: Jun 28, 2023ASSIGNMENT OF BID TO
Date: Jun 23, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS
Date: Jun 19, 2023NOTICE OF FILING
Date: Jun 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: Jun 16, 2023PAID 70.00 ON RECEIPT 2842864, FULLY PAID
Date: Jun 13, 2023CERTIFICATE OF SALE ISSUED TO
Date: Jun 13, 2023PAID 303,541.50 ON RECEIPT 2842811, FULLY PAID
Date: Jun 13, 2023FORECLOSURE SALE BID SHEET WITH ATTACHED BIDDING DOCUMENTATION
Date: Jun 13, 2023ASSIGNMENT OF BID TO
Date: Jun 06, 2023PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF SALE
Date: May 22, 2023PROPOSED DOCUMENT
Date: May 02, 2023NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE ISSUED AND
Date: Apr 10, 2023FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: Apr 10, 2023FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: Apr 10, 2023CLERKS LETTER
Date: Feb 24, 2023NOTICE OF FILING
Date: Feb 24, 2023NOTICE OF FILING
Date: Feb 24, 2023NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING
Date: Feb 22, 2023NOTICE OF FILING
Date: Feb 22, 2023NOTICE OF FILING
Date: Feb 22, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR
Date: Feb 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: Dec 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEYS FEES
Date: Dec 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS
Date: Dec 13, 2022MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: Dec 13, 2022NOTICE OF FILING
Date: Sep 12, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS AS TO BOWEN AKA LYNN M BOWEN, LYNN MARIE
Date: Sep 12, 2022MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: Sep 01, 2022PROPOSED DEFAULT
Date: Sep 01, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE
Date: Aug 22, 2022SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO SUNNOVA SLA MANAGEMENT LLC, / 07/14/2022
Date: Aug 03, 2022SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO LAKE COUNTY FLORIDA, / 07/12/2022
Date: Aug 03, 2022SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 2, / 07/11/2022
Date: Aug 03, 2022SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 1, / 07/11/2022
Date: Aug 03, 2022CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: Jul 27, 2022ANSWER OF LAKE COUNTY FLORIDA,
Date: Jul 21, 2022PAID 1,008.50 ON RECEIPT 2750078, FULLY PAID
Date: Jul 19, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 2,
Date: Jul 01, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 1,
Date: Jul 01, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO GREATER GROVES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC,
Date: Jul 01, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO LAKE COUNTY FLORIDA,
Date: Jul 01, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO BOWEN AKA LYNN M BOWEN UNKNOWN SPOUSE, LYNN MARIE
Date: Jul 01, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO SUNNOVA SLA MANAGEMENT LLC,
Date: Jul 01, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO BOWEN AKA LYNN M BOWEN, LYNN MARIE
Date: Jul 01, 2022PAID 1,010.50 ON RECEIPT 2750078, FULLY PAID
Date: Jul 01, 2022NOTICE OF FILING
Date: Jun 30, 2022SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: Jun 30, 2022LIS PENDENS
Date: Jun 30, 2022VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM
Date: Jun 30, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: Jun 30, 2022CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: Jun 30, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
REFUND REQUEST ISSUED 2879148 $105,223.37 THE RECOVERY AGENTS LLC |
|
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON TRA'S MOTION TO INTERVENE AND DISBURSE SURPLUS FUNDS / GRANTED |
|
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
COVER LETTER DATED OCTOBER 12, 2023 / TO JUDGE / REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER |
|
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
COPY OF EMAIL CORRESPONDENCE |
|
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
REFUND REQUEST ISSUED 2876610 $41,308.49 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION C/O KAHANE & ASSOCIATES, P.A. |
|
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SURPLUS FUNDS / GRANTED |
|
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR 10/16/2023 AT 11:00 AM |
|
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR // AMENDED // 10/06/2023 AT 11:00 AM VIA ZOOM |
|
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR 10/06/2023 AT 11:00 AM |
|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
REFUND REQUEST ISSUED 2866846 $150,468.14 NEWREZ LLC DBA SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING C/O LOGS LEGAL GROUP LLP |
|
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING OF AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SURPLUS FUNDS |
|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
PAID $50.00 ON RECEIPT 2854399, FULLY PAID $50.00 2854399 Fully Paid |
|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO INTERVENE AND DISBURSE SURPLUS FUNDS |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF SHEREE EDWARDS ESQ FOR DEFT |
|
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED POSTED 07/07/2023 POSTED / WRIT ENFORCED 07/11/2023 |
|
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION // GRANTED |
|
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED & DELIVERED TO / MAILED TO AKSELL & VARGO P.A. |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION OR ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF BLUE SPRING PLANTATION INC. |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | PROPOSED DOCUMENT | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO BLUE SPRING PLANTATION, INC // FILED AND RECORDED COPIES MAILED TO SERVICE LIST |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
ASSIGNMENT OF BID TO BLUE SPRING PLANTATION, INC // FILED AND RECORDED // WITH $.70 DOC STAMPS |
|
June 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS ASHTON ROOKS ESQ. FOR |
|
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF POST JUDGMENT ADVANCES AND POST JUDGMENT INTEREST |
|
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF POST JUDGMENT ADVANCES AND POST JUDGMENT INTEREST |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
PAID $70.00 ON RECEIPT 2842864, FULLY PAID $70.00 2842864 Fully Paid |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE ISSUED TO KAL HOLDING I-E, LLC // FOR BID OF $297,000 // TITLE TO BE ISSUED ON JUNE 26, 2023 |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
PAID $303,541.50 ON RECEIPT 2842811, FULLY PAID $303,541.50 2842811 Fully Paid |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SALE BID SHEET WITH ATTACHED BIDDING DOCUMENTATION | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
ASSIGNMENT OF BID TO FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION // FILED AND RECORDED |
|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF SALE PUBLISHED IN THE NORTH LAKE OUTPOST ON 5-11-23 AND 5-18-23 |
|
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED DOCUMENT // NOT ISSUED ALREADY ISSUED ON 4/10/2023 |
|
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE ISSUED AND MAILED TO ATTORNEY TO PUBLISH // SALE SET FOR JUNE 13, 2023 AT 11:00 AM |
|
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE $148,327.25 // SALE SET FOR JUNE 13, 2023 AT 11:00 AM |
|
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S LETTER DATED 02/24/2023 / REGARDING NOTICE OF DETERMINATION OF NON-CONFIDENTIALITY |
|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFF'S COPY OF MORTGAGE |
|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENT ( ORIGINAL DOCUMENT ) |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING COPY OF MORTGAGE |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENT (NOT ORIGINALS) |
|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR APRIL 6, 2023 AT 9:30 |
|
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS AS TO BOWEN AKA LYNN M BOWEN, LYNN MARIE BOWEN AKA LYNN M BOWEN, LYNN MARIE |
|
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO BOWEN AKA LYNN M BOWEN, LYNN MARIE,JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST BY PURCHASE FROM THE FDIC AS RECEIVER OF WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK FA,,SUNNOVA SLA MANAGEMENT LLC,,GREATER GROVES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC,,UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 1,,UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 2, NKA PAMELA BROWN BOWEN AKA LYNN M BOWEN, LYNN MARIE,JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST BY PURCHASE FROM THE FDIC AS RECEIVER OF WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK FA,,SUNNOVA SLA MANAGEMENT LLC,,GREATER GROVES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC,,UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 1,,UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 2, NKA PAMELA BROWN |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | PROPOSED DEFAULT | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTIES NAMED AS BOWEN AKA LYNN M BOWEN UNKNOWN SPOUSE, LYNN MARIE BOWEN AKA LYNN M BOWEN UNKNOWN SPOUSE, LYNN MARIE |
|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DIFFERENTIATED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER |
|
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO SUNNOVA SLA MANAGEMENT LLC, / 07/14/2022 SUNNOVA SLA MANAGEMENT LLC, 07/14/2022 |
|
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST BY PURCHASE FROM THE FDIC AS RECEIVER OF WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK FA, / 07/08/2022 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST BY PURCHASE FROM THE FDIC AS RECEIVER OF WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK FA, 07/08/2022 |
|
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO BOWEN AKA LYNN M BOWEN, LYNN MARIE / 07/25/2022 BOWEN AKA LYNN M BOWEN, LYNN MARIE 07/25/2022 |
|
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVICE AS TO BOWEN AKA LYNN M BOWEN UNKNOWN SPOUSE, LYNN MARIE BOWEN AKA LYNN M BOWEN UNKNOWN SPOUSE, LYNN MARIE JULY 25, 2022 |
|
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO GREATER GROVES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC, / 07/13/2022 GREATER GROVES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC, 07/13/2022 |
|
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO LAKE COUNTY FLORIDA, / 07/12/2022 LAKE COUNTY FLORIDA, 07/12/2022 |
|
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 2, / 07/11/2022 UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 2, 07/11/2022 NKA PAMELA BROWN |
|
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 1, / 07/11/2022 UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 1, 07/11/2022 |
|
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER // DIFFERENTIATED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AS TO STREAMLINED CASE TYPES |
|
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF LAKE COUNTY FLORIDA, LAKE COUNTY FLORIDA, |
|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
PAID $1,008.50 ON RECEIPT 2750078, FULLY PAID $1,008.50 2750078 Fully Paid |
|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | REVISED, RECEIPT NUMBER 2750078 | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 2, UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 2, |
|
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 1, UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 1, |
|
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED TO GREATER GROVES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC, GREATER GROVES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC, |
|
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED TO LAKE COUNTY FLORIDA, LAKE COUNTY FLORIDA, |
|
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED TO BOWEN AKA LYNN M BOWEN UNKNOWN SPOUSE, LYNN MARIE BOWEN AKA LYNN M BOWEN UNKNOWN SPOUSE, LYNN MARIE |
|
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED TO SUNNOVA SLA MANAGEMENT LLC, SUNNOVA SLA MANAGEMENT LLC, |
|
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED TO JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST BY PURCHASE FROM THE FDIC AS RECEIVER OF WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK FA, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST BY PURCHASE FROM THE FDIC AS RECEIVER OF WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK FA, |
|
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED TO BOWEN AKA LYNN M BOWEN, LYNN MARIE BOWEN AKA LYNN M BOWEN, LYNN MARIE |
|
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
PAID $1,010.50 ON RECEIPT 2750078, FULLY PAID $1,010.50 2750078 Fully Paid |
|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE // ATTACHED |
|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK | |
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | LIS PENDENS | |
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM | |
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE |
|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |