Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CARRILLO, MANUEL
On May 31, 2022 contract and indebtedness case was filed by (Subcribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL. Judge DAVIS, HEIDI presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 31, 2022
Last Refreshed
October 10, 2023
Filing Location
Lake County, FL
Category
Circuit Civil
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Dismissal
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT Il BREAC H REL NALI OF CONT NI RACTRACT
COUNT III UNJUST ENRICHMENT
or arising from claims; demands or causes of action instituted by Bu: yer or Seller based on: (i) inaccuracy of
Parties
Plaintiffs
Case Documents
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: Aug 17, 2022MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: Jun 21, 2022CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: Jun 02, 2022PAID 419.00 ON RECEIPT 2742287, FULLY PAID
Date: Jun 01, 2022LIS PENDENS
Date: May 31, 2022SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: May 31, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: May 31, 2022CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: May 31, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF JANET WHITLOCK KENNEDY // WITH PREJUDICE & RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS |
|
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT // WITH ATTACHMENT |
|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO WHITLOCK KENNEDY POWER OF ATTORNEY FOR MAE WHITLOCK LIFE ESTATE, JANET / 06/04/2022 WHITLOCK KENNEDY POWER OF ATTORNEY FOR MAE WHITLOCK LIFE ESTATE, JANET 06/04/2022 |
|
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED TO WHITLOCK KENNEDY POWER OF ATTORNEY FOR MAE WHITLOCK LIFE ESTATE, JANET WHITLOCK KENNEDY POWER OF ATTORNEY FOR MAE WHITLOCK LIFE ESTATE, JANET |
|
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
PAID $419.00 ON RECEIPT 2742287, FULLY PAID $419.00 2742287 Fully Paid |
|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event | LIS PENDENS | |
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK | |
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |