Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ARANGO, CHRISTOPHER
A Misdemeanor case was filed in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL. Judge JONES, SARAH J presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 17, 2021
Last Refreshed
October 10, 2023
Filing Location
Lake County, FL
Judge
Category
Misdemeanor
Practice Area
Criminal
Matter Type
General Criminal
Status
Active
Parties
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
CERTIFIED COPY OF RESTITUTION ORDER
Date: Jan 06, 2022RESTITUTION ORDER
Date: Jan 05, 2022MOTION TO MODIFY
Date: Dec 17, 2021VICTIM NOTIFICATION/IDENTIFICATION INFORMATION
Date: Sep 17, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER
Date: Sep 17, 2021ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED
Date: Sep 17, 2021ARREST AFFIDAVIT
Date: Sep 17, 2021NO VICTIM CONTACT ORDER
Date: Sep 17, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
JUDGE REASSIGNMENT PER ADMIN ORDER L-2021-23-B DATED JUNE 3, 2022 SENIOR COVERAGE JUDGE 6, JONES, SARAH J Per Admin Order L-2021-23-B dated June 3, 2022 |
|
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
JUDGE REASSIGNMENT EFFECTIVE JANUARY 21, 2022 NIMETH, JASON J SENIOR COVERAGE JUDGE 6, Effective January 21, 2022 |
|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED COPY OF RESTITUTION ORDER | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
RESTITUTION ORDER AMENDED |
|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT PRESENT | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Sentence will be amnded to include restitution by separate order Sentence will be amnded to include restitution by separate order | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion granted Motion granted | |
December 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
SET ON MMMH - MOTION HEARING DOCKET 1/5/2022 BEGINNING AT 1:30 PM MMMH - MOTION HEARING 1/5/2022 1:30 PM |
|
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO MODIFY SENTENCE |
|
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY PUBLIC DEFENDER | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT ASSESSING FEES, SERVICE CHARGES, COSTS AND FINES | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | $200.00 PUBLIC DEFENDER FEE | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | 50 DAYS TO PAY DUE BY 12/29/2021 | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | $50.00 PUBLIC DEFENDER APPLICATION FEE | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | $575.00 COURT COSTS | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | $100.00 COST OF PROSECUTION | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
DOCKET FEES ASSESSED #LAKE - CRIMINAL COSTS OF INCARCERATION (960.293) - $2,250.00 |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
DOCKET FEES ASSESSED #LAKE - CRIMINAL RECORDING & SATISFACTION FEES ($22) - $22.00 |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Advised of Enhanceable Offense | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant to sign up for a payment plan w/in 5 days of release or DL will be suspended | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Printed | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | $50/day cost of incarceration | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Mandatory Costs Assessed | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Counts run concurrent | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOLO CONTENDERE | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Concurrent with any other case | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | CREDIT FOR ANY TIME SERVED | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | In Custody | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
COUNTY JAIL 45 DAYS 45 Days |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | CREDIT FOR GAIN TIME EARNED | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | ADJUDICATED GUILTY | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT PRESENT | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | FINGERPRINTS | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT ASSESSING FEES, SERVICE CHARGES, COSTS AND FINES | |
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBITS | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASES FOR PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE AND SENTENCING | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY FILED BY PD | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | NOT GUILTY | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | VICTIM NOTIFICATION/IDENTIFICATION INFORMATION | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
ARREST AFFIDAVIT **NO VICTIM CONTACT** |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | NO VICTIM CONTACT ORDER | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
SET ON SNT - TRAFFIC/MISDEMEANOR SENTENCING DOCKET 11/9/2021 BEGINNING AT 1:30 PM SNT - TRAFFIC/MISDEMEANOR SENTENCING 11/9/2021 1:30 PM |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
SET ON PNC - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE DOCKET 10/28/2021 BEGINNING AT 9:30 AM PNC - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE 10/28/2021 9:30 AM |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
741.31(4A) CONTEMPT OF COURT-VIOL INJUNCTION PROTECTION DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 741.31(4a) |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
784.03(1A1) BATTERY-TOUCH OR STRIKE 784.03(1a1) |