Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
EARWOOD, JESSICA ROSE
On November 30, 2015 a paternity case was filed in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL. Judge SINGELTARY, G RICHARD presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 30, 2015
Last Refreshed
October 22, 2022
Filing Location
Lake County, FL
Judge
Hon. SINGELTARY, G RICHARD
Category
Domestic Relations/Family
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Active
Parties
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR MODIFICATION MAILE TO JOHN JANES |
|
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR MODIFICATION OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY |
|
February 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIPULATION FOR MODIFICATION OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY |
|
February 06, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASES | |
October 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
INFORMATION CHANGE REQUEST FORMS EARWOOD, JESSICA ROSE EARWOOD, JESSICA ROSE |
|
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NON-REPRESENTATION | |
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT/CERTIFICATE OF DELINQUENCY FILED AND RECORDED | |
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY IN CHILD SUPPORT PAYMENTS | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF | |
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
CHILD SUPPORT WORKING COPY OF ORDER |
|
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPROVING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GM ON MOTHER'S OBJECTION TO DELINQUENCY ACTION |
|
October 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE ON MOTHER'S OBJECTION TO DELQ ACTION |
|
August 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME, PHYSICAL ADDRESS AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES |
|
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTARIZED STATEMENT GIVING CREDIT FOR DIRECT PAYMENTS | |
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR OCTOBER 11, 2017 AT 9:30 AM |
|
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM FROM THE JUDGE REGARDING DELINQUENCY OBJECTION | |
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
August 03, 2017 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM TO THE JUDGE REGARDING DIRECT PAYMENTS | |
August 01, 2017 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO DELINQUENCY NOTICE WITH PROOF OF DIRECT PAYMENTS | |
August 01, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
August 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
INFORMATION CHANGE REQUEST FORMS EARWOOD, JESSICA ROSE EARWOOD, JESSICA ROSE |
|
August 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
PAID $5.30 ON RECEIPT 2273573, FULLY PAID $5.30 2273573 Fully Paid |
|
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NON-REPRESENTATION | |
July 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE BY PARENTING COORDINATOR |
|
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM TO THE CLERK / SEALED PER FLORIDA STATUTE | |
July 26, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY IN CHILD SUPPORT PAYMENTS | |
July 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
CHILD SUPPORT WORKING COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY |
|
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
AMENDED ORDER APPOINTING PARENTING COORDINATOR |
|
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM TO THE CLERK / SEALED PER FLORIDA STATUTE | |
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event | INCOME WITHHOLDING FOR SUPPORT | |
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event | AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT FILED AND RECORDED | |
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER DATED | |
July 11, 2017 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM TO THE CLERK / SEALED PER FLORIDA STATUTE | |
June 13, 2017 | Docket Event | CLERK'S LETTER | |
June 05, 2017 | Docket Event | DISPOSED BY JUDGE | |
June 05, 2017 | Docket Event | ATTY. FOR PETITIONER: ARCHER, DANIEL D | |
June 05, 2017 | Docket Event | ATTY. FOR RESPONDENT: SPRYSENSKI, CHRISTOPHER M | |
June 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY/SIGNED JUNE 5, 2017/ FILED AND RECORDED 19 PAGES WITH ATTACHED PARENTING PLAN / CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET/ CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES INCOME ATTACHMENT |
|
June 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
COVER LETTER DATED MAY 28, 2016 FROM ATTY SPRYSENSKI TO JUDGE SINGELTARY/RE: PROPOSED ORDER |
|
June 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPOINTING PARENTING COORDINATOR/SIGNED 06/05/17 |
|
May 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR MAY 19, 2017/ 9:30 AM |
|
April 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
CHRONOLOGICAL SUMMARY OF PROCEEDINGS HELD BEFORE JUDGE SINGELTARY 04/13/17/ FILED IN OPEN COURT |
|
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES |
|
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO USE SUMMARIES |
|
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING REPORT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM/ATTACHMENT |
|
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING TRIAL/ SIGNED 03/31/17 SCHEDULED APRIL 13, 2017/ 9:00 AM |
|
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
COVER LETTER DATED MARCH 27 FROM ATTY SPRYSENSKI TO JUDGE SINGELTARY/RE: PROPOSED ORDER |
|
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF ATTORNEY SPRYSENSKI ON 03/29/17-03/31/17 |
|
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE CORPORATION'S DEPOSITON AND DEMAND FOR DESIGNATION OF REPRSENTATIVE DEPONENT |
|
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL/SIGNED BY JUDGE SINGELTARY 12/05/16(TRIAL SCHEDULED NOV 30, 2016 CANCELLED) |
|
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
COVER LETTER DATED NOV 30, 2016/ FROM ATTY ARCHER/ ATTACHMENT/// TO JUDGE SINGLETARY/ RE: PROPOSED ORDER |
|
November 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL |
|
September 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY AMENDED / OF ATTY SPRYSENSKI |
|
September 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PRODUCE AT HEARING |
|
August 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITME/SIGNED 08/10/16/ NUNC PRO TUNC JULY 12, 2016 |
|
August 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
COVER LETTER DATED JULY 28, 2016 FROM ATTY ARCHER TO JUDGE SINGELTARY/RE: PROPOSED ORDER |
|
August 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER AFTER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE/ SIGNED 08/10/16/ NUNC PRO TUNC 07/12/16// TRIAL SCHEDULED 11/30/16/ 9:00 AM |
|
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR SEPTEMBER 12, 2016/ 9:15 AM |
|
August 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION VERIFIED MOTION FOR ENFORCEMENT AND CONTEMPT FOR PETITIONER'S FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH JUNE 27, 2016 ORDER ADJUDGING RESPONDENT FATHER AND PROVIDING FOR SHARED PARENTAL RESPONSIBILITY AND ESTABLISHING TEMPORARY TIMESHARING SCHEDULE |
|
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
COPY OF CERTIFIED STATEMENT OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY ORIGINAL MAILED TO OFFICE OF VITAL STATISTICS/ ALONG WITH CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER |
|
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S LETTER DATED JUNE 28, 2016 TO ATTY ARCHER/RE: CERTIFIED STATEMENT OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY |
|
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR 7/12/16 AT 8:45 AM (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) |
|
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER ADJUDGING RESPONDENT FATHER AND PROVIDING FOR SHARED PARENTAL RESPONSIBILITY, AND ESTABLISHING TEMPORARY TIMESHARING SCHEDULE/ SIGNED JUNE 27, 2016 |
|
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
COVER LETTER DATED JUNE 21, 2016 FROM ATTY SPRYSENSKI TO JUDGE SINGELTARY/RE: PROPOSED ORDER |
|
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY ATTY SPRYSENSKI'S |
|
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION UNDER THE UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT | |
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER JANES, JOHN JEFFREY JANES, JOHN JEFFREY |
|
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION | |
June 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION OF PARENTING COURSE BY JANES, JOHN JEFFREY JANES, JOHN JEFFREY NOTICE OF FILING / ATTACHMENT |
|
June 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
PAID $295.00 ON RECEIPT 2155725, FULLY PAID $295.00 2155725 Fully Paid |
|
June 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET NOTICE OF FILING / ATTACHMENT |
|
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
TRANSCRIPT OF DEPOSITION OF JESSICA KIRKLAN FROM 4/15/2016 |
|
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
TRANSCRIPT OF DEPOSITION OF JOSHUA KIRKLAN FOR 4/15/2016 |
|
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF 12/22/2015 MOTION TO DISMISS |
|
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS OF JESSICA ROSE EARWOOD TAKEN 04/15/16// AND OF NON PARTY JOSHUA KIRKLAND TAKEN 04/15/16 |
|
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND VERIFIED COUNTER PETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND FOR RELATED RELIEF / ATTACHMENT/FILED BY JANES, JOHN JEFFREY JANES, JOHN JEFFREY |
|
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE FOR TRIAL ESTIMATED 1 DAY |
|
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR AMENDED / SCHEDULED JUNE 15, 2016 / 3:00 PM |
|
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS OF JESSICA EARWOOD AND JOSH KIRKLAND APRIL 15, 2016 /9:30 AM OF (JESSICA EARWOOD) AND 3:00 PM OF (JOSH KIRKLAND) | |
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR 4/15/2016 AT 3PM |
|
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION RESPONDENT / JOHN JEFFREY JANES' RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION WITH INCORPORATED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME |
|
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION RESPONDENT JOHN JEFFREY JANES' OBJECTIONS TO FIRST INTERROGATORIES WITH INCORPORATED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME |
|
March 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITME |
|
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT OF EARWOOD, JESSICA ROSE EARWOOD, JESSICA ROSE NOTICE OF FILING MOTHER'S /// ATTACHMENT |
|
February 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE BY EARWOOD, JESSICA ROSE EARWOOD, JESSICA ROSE |
|
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR COURT ORDERED MEDIATION |
|
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION / SIGNED 02/17/16 |
|
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
COVER LETTER DATED 02/02/16 FROM ATTY ARCHER TO JUDGE SINGELTARY/RE: PROPOSED ORDER |
|
February 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF REFERRAL TO COURT MEDIATION/SIGNED 02/17/16/ 2 PAGES WITH ATTACHED JOINT STIPULATION FOR ORDER OF MEDIATION |
|
February 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
COVER LETTER DATED FEB 10, 2016 FROM ATTY ARCHER TO JUDGE SINGELTARY/RE: PROPOSED ORDER |
|
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT OF JANES, JOHN JEFFREY JANES, JOHN JEFFREY |
|
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE BY JANES, JOHN JEFFREY JANES, JOHN JEFFREY |
|
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF COURSE COMPLETION/ATTACHMENT |
|
February 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION 9:30 AM MARCH 3, 2016 |
|
February 10, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR TEMPORARY PARENTING PLAN | |
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIPULATION FOR ORDER TO MEDITION |
|
February 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE/ATTACHMENT |
|
February 04, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES | |
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NEW ADDRESS FOR PETITIONER/MOTHER |
|
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS | |
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS PETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND FOR RELATED RELIEF |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
PAID $22.00 ON RECEIPT 2099176, FULLY PAID $22.00 2099176 Fully Paid |
|
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO JANES, JOHN JEFFREY / 12/04/2015 JANES, JOHN JEFFREY 12/04/2015 |
|
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
PARENTING PLAN SIGNED BY MOTHER |
|
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event | 120 DAYS TO SERVE OTHER PARTY | |
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASES | |
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM TO THE CLERK / SEALED PER FLORIDA STATUTE | |
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
PETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND FOR RELATED RELIEF |
|
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
PAID $320.85 ON RECEIPT 2092971, FULLY PAID $320.85 2092971 Fully Paid |
|
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED TO JANES, JOHN JEFFREY JANES, JOHN JEFFREY |
|
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET PRO SE | |
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER EARWOOD, JESSICA ROSE EARWOOD, JESSICA ROSE |
|
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION UNDER THE UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT | |
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT OF EARWOOD, JESSICA ROSE EARWOOD, JESSICA ROSE |