Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
YOSHIKAWA, TOMOKO
On August 31, 2015 a negligence-business tort case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL. Judge MOSLEY, DAN R presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 31, 2015
Last Refreshed
October 02, 2023
Filing Location
Lake County, FL
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
G. Richard Singeltary;Category
Circuit Civil
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Economic Torts
Status
Dismissal
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT Il - FRAUDULENT CONCEA NT (Ms. Yoshikawa v. Dealership)
COUNT IV —- NEGLIGENCE (Ms. Yoshikawa v. Dealership)
COUNT V-— VIOLATIONS OF FLORIDA’S DECEPTIVE AND UNFAIR TRADE PRACTICES ACT (Ms. Yoshikawa v. Dealership)
COUNT VI- CLAIM ON MOTOR VEHICLE DEALER LETTER OF CREDIT (Ms. Yoshikawa v. Bank)
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Tomoko Yoshikawa against FL Auto Wholesalers, Inc. and Harbor Community Bank in the Circuit Court of the Fifth Judicial Circuit in Lake County, Florida. The complaint alleges damages in excess of $15,000, declaratory an…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL
Date: Aug 03, 2020ORDER
Date: Aug 03, 2020ORDER
Date: May 19, 2020COVER LETTER DATED
Date: May 19, 2020MOTION
Date: May 18, 2020ORDER
Date: May 14, 2020MOTION
Date: Apr 29, 2020AMENDED ORDER
Date: Apr 28, 2020ORDER
Date: Mar 16, 2020MOTION
Date: Mar 06, 2020ORDER
Date: Feb 14, 2020NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Date: Jan 29, 2020TEXT
Date: Apr 18, 2019DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS
Date: Apr 03, 2019NOTICE OF CANCELLATION
Date: May 31, 2017NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR
Date: Mar 06, 2017MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: Feb 22, 2017AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: Feb 17, 2017ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF SERVICE AS TO HCBF HOLDING COMPANY INC,
Date: Feb 16, 2017MAIL RETURNED
Date: Feb 09, 2017ORDER
Date: Jan 20, 2017MAIL RETURNED
Date: Jan 18, 2017NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF SERVICE AS TO HCBF HOLDING COMPANY INC,
Date: Jan 18, 2017ORDER
Date: Jan 04, 2017COVER LETTER DATED
Date: Jan 04, 2017REPLY
Date: Dec 30, 2016MOTION
Date: Dec 27, 2016MEMORANDUM
Date: Dec 27, 2016ANSWER OF FL AUTO WHOLESALERS INC,
Date: Nov 10, 2016NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: Nov 09, 2016RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: Nov 09, 2016COVER LETTER DATED
Date: Nov 02, 2016ORDER
Date: Nov 02, 2016ORDER
Date: Nov 02, 2016RESPONSE
Date: Oct 14, 2016NOTICE
Date: Oct 05, 2016NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: Oct 05, 2016NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR
Date: Sep 30, 2016MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: Sep 21, 2016ORDER
Date: Sep 07, 2016COVER LETTER DATED
Date: Sep 07, 2016MOTION
Date: Aug 24, 2016NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR
Date: Aug 19, 2016SUMMONS ISSUED TO HARBOR COMMUNITY BANK,
Date: Jul 21, 2016PAID 10.00 ON RECEIPT 2166931, FULLY PAID
Date: Jul 21, 2016SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: Jul 20, 2016SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE
Date: Jul 20, 2016NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR
Date: Jul 11, 2016NOTICE OF CANCELLATION
Date: May 06, 2016NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR
Date: Feb 04, 2016MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: Jan 04, 2016MOTION
Date: Dec 11, 2015DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS
Date: Dec 11, 2015AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: Nov 25, 2015SUMMONS ISSUED TO SUMMONS ISSUED TO FL AUTO WHOLESALERS, INC.
Date: Sep 01, 2015COMPLAINT
Date: Aug 31, 2015DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS
Date: Aug 31, 2015NOTICE
Date: Aug 31, 2015SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: Aug 31, 2015CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: Aug 31, 2015Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL (VOLUNTARY) WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING PLTF'S MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY |
|
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
COVER LETTER DATED MAY 18 2020 |
|
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AS TO CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON AUGUST 4, 2020 |
|
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON DEFT'S MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY // GRANTED |
|
April 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY |
|
April 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR AUG 4 2020 AT 10:45 AM |
|
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON DEFT'S MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY ON MAY 21 2020 AT 3:45 PM // DENIED |
|
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION | |
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR MAY 21 2020 AT 3:45 PM |
|
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS | |
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
JUDGE REASSIGNMENT PER ADMIN ORDER 2018-56-A SINGELTARY, G RICHARD MOSLEY, DAN R Per Admin Order 2018-56-A |
|
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
TEXT DATED APRIL 17, 2019 FROM JUDICIAL ASSISTANT |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS | |
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING ON 6/8/17 AT 9:00 AM |
|
March 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR JUNE 8, 2017 AT 9:00 AM |
|
February 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT BY KENNETH MILLS |
|
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
February 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF SERVICE AS TO HCBF HOLDING COMPANY INC, HCBF HOLDING COMPANY INC, |
|
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
MAIL RETURNED ADDRESSED TO JOSHAU A COSSEY, ESQ // ORDER GRANTING HARBOR COMMUNITY BANK'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED |
|
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING HARBOR COMMUNITY BANKS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED | |
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
MAIL RETURNED MAIL RETURN ENVELOPE AS TO ORDER ON MOITO FOR TIME FOR DEFENDANT HARBOR COMMUNITY BANK TO FILE A REPLY PLEADING TO PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DFENDANT HARBOR COMMUITY BANK'S MOTION TO DISMISS TO JOSHUA A COSSEY ESQ |
|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF SERVICE AS TO HCBF HOLDING COMPANY INC, HCBF HOLDING COMPANY INC, |
|
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON MOTION FOR TIME FOR DEFT HARBOR COMMUNITY BANK TO FILE A REPLY PLEADING TO PLTF'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFT HARBOR COMMUNITY BANK'S MOTION TO DISMISS |
|
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
COVER LETTER DATED DEC 27, 2016 TO JUDGE G\. Richard Singeltary / FILING PROPOSED ORDER AS TO MOTION FOR TIME FOR DEFT HARBOR COMMUNITY BANK TO FILE A REPLY PLEADING TO PLTF'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFT, HARBOR COMMUNITY BANK'S MOTION TO DISMISS |
|
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
REPLY HARBOR'S REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS |
|
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR TIME FOR DEFENDANT HARBOR COMMUNITY BANK TO FILE A REPLY PLEADING TO PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT HARBOR COMMUNITY BANK'S MOTION TO DISMISS |
|
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT, HARBOR COMMUNITY BANK'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED |
|
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF FL AUTO WHOLESALERS INC, FL AUTO WHOLESALERS INC, |
|
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES |
|
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
COVER LETTER DATED OCT 24, 2016 RE PROPOSED ORDERS |
|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPROVING PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE |
|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT, FL AUTO WHOLESALERS, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS 1 THROUGH V OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
October 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS 1 THROUGH V OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW |
|
October 05, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PRODUCE TO PLTF | |
October 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES DEFT FL AUTO WHOLESALERS INC'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF |
|
September 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR NOVEMBER 28, 2016 AT 10:45 AM ON DEFENDANT HARBOR COMMUNITY BANK'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED |
|
September 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED / FILED BY DEFT HARBOR COMMUNITY BANK |
|
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT, HARBOR COMMUNITY BANK'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO RESPOND // GRANTED |
|
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
COVER LETTER DATED AUG 31, 2016 RE ORDER |
|
August 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO RESPOND |
|
August 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR OCTOBER 17, 2016 AT 3:45 PM ON DEFENDANT FL AUTO WHOLESALERS INC'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS I THROUGH V OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SHOWING GOOD CAUSE |
|
July 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED TO HARBOR COMMUNITY BANK, HARBOR COMMUNITY BANK, |
|
July 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 2166931, FULLY PAID $10.00 2166931 Fully Paid |
|
July 20, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED | |
July 20, 2016 | Docket Event | SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE | |
July 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR OCT 17 2016 AT 3:45 PM ON DEFTS MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS I THROUGH V OF PLTFS COMPLAINT |
|
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF SERVICE AS TO HCBF HOLDING COMPANY INC,,HARBOR COMMUNITY BANK, HCBF HOLDING COMPANY INC,,HARBOR COMMUNITY BANK, |
|
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING SCHEDULED FOR MAY 9 2016 AT 10:00 AM |
|
February 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR MAY 9, 2016 AT 10:00 AM ON DEFT FL AUTO WHOLESLERS INC'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS I THROUGH V OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS 1 THROUGH V OF PLTF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
December 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME / FILED BY DEFT FL AUTO WHOLESALERS INC |
|
December 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS FOR DEFT FL AUTO WHOLESALERS INC |
|
November 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED |
|
September 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED TO SUMMONS ISSUED TO FL AUTO WHOLESALERS, INC. SUMMONS ISSUED TO FL AUTO WHOLESALERS, INC. |
|
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT // JURY TRIAL DEMAND | |
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS | |
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISPOSE OR ALTER VEHICLE | |
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED | |
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event | ISSUING SUMMONS / CIRCUIT CIVIL Receipt: 388608 Date: 08/31/2015 | |
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event | FILING FEE ASSESSED-CIVIL ACTION Receipt: 388608 Date: 08/31/2015 |