Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
STATE OF FLORIDA vs. HENRY, KWAME KEVIN
A case was filed against Henry, Kwame Kevin, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. Judge STONE, ROBYN E. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 24, 2021
Last Refreshed
September 08, 2023
Filing Location
Indian River County, FL
Judge
Practice Area
Criminal
Matter Type
Criminal Related (Civil)
Status
Closed
Parties
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - A3KXB4P | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - A3KXB4P | |
October 17, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF GUILTY SEQ 1 | |
October 17, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $113.00 RECEIPT #2021033194 | |
October 17, 2021 | Docket Event | PAID FINE SEQ: 1 | |
October 17, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
October 17, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE# 2021 TR 008648 A - SENTENCE IMPOSED: 10/17/2021 EFFECTIVE DATE: 10/17/2021 | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION A3KXB4P FILED, OFFENSE DATE 09/18/2021 | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | ADD SENT TO TCATS - A3KXB4P | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : 30 DAYS TO PAY FINE REQUIRED BY: 10/18/2021 | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT INFORMATION SHEET | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 09/24/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 TR 008648 A | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED SEQ: 1 - (316.187(1 2 A B)) UNLAWFUL SPEED 06-29 MILES OVER |