Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
STATE OF FLORIDA vs. THOMAS, LIL WILLIE
A case was filed against Thomas, Lil Willie, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. Judge MENZ, NICOLE presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 17, 2021
Last Refreshed
September 07, 2023
Filing Location
Indian River County, FL
Parties
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AEETUYE | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AEETUYE | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $438.00 RECEIPT #2021033450 | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE# 2021 TR 008487 A - SENTENCE IMPOSED: 10/19/2021 EFFECTIVE DATE: 10/19/2021 | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT RECEIPT | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF NOLO-CONTENDERE SEQ 1 | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | CHARGE CNT 1 SENTENCING NOTES: PNC; ADJ/G; $350 FINE; $88 COURT COSTS; PAY OR ENTER A PAYMENT PLAN TODAY. | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | GUILTY SEQ: 1 | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED SEQ: 1 - (316.187(1 2 A B)) UNLAWFUL SPEED 30 AND ABOVE | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION AEETUYE FILED, OFFENSE DATE 09/16/2021 | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | ADD SENT TO TCATS - AEETUYE | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 10/19/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN 3/ , JDG: Menz, Nicole | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 09/17/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 TR 008487 A |