Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
STATE OF FLORIDA vs. BENITEZ, TABITHA DANIELLE
A case was filed against Benitez, Tabitha Danielle, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. Judge STONE, ROBYN E. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 04, 2021
Last Refreshed
September 09, 2023
Filing Location
Indian River County, FL
Judge
Practice Area
Criminal
Matter Type
Criminal Related (Civil)
Status
Closed
Parties
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $243.00 RECEIPT #2022004285 | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | D6 ISSUED 01/26/2022 / LICENSE SUSPENDED - FAILED TO PAY $220.00 ADDITIONAL CLEARANCE FEE DUE | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | D-6 SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | CHARGE CNT 1 SENTENCING NOTES: PNC: ADJ/W; DEF MUST PAY $25 PLUS ADDITIONAL $100 FINE; $88 CC; $7 SUBPOENA FEE BY 01/09/2022. ATTY GILES PRESENT FOR ATTY DIAMOND. | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | ADJ W/H JUDGE SEQ: 1 | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE# 2021 TR 008173 A - SENTENCE IMPOSED: 11/10/2021 EFFECTIVE DATE: 11/10/2021 | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF NOLO-CONTENDERE SEQ 1 | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : FINES AND/OR COURT COSTS REQUIRED BY: 01/09/2022 | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - ACXVJJE | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - ACXVJJE | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT RECEIPT | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | TRF SUBPOENA SERVED | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | SUSPENSION BLOCKED | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | TRF SUBPOENA ISSUED | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | INFRACTION COURT SET FOR 11/10/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 1/ , JDG: TRAFFIC HEARING OFFICER | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ATTORNEY: DIAMOND, JASON ASSIGNED | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $23.00 RECEIPT #2021033117 | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312021TR008173AXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: TSUBP-10/15/2021 | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO DIAMOND, JASON RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312021TR008173AXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: TNOH-10/15/2021 | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | D6 ISSUED 10/11/2021 / LICENSE SUSPENDED - FAILED TO PAY $113.00 ADDITIONAL CLEARANCE FEE DUE | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | D-6 SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : 30 DAYS TO PAY FINE REQUIRED BY: 10/04/2021 | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | ADD SENT TO TCATS - ACXVJJE | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION ACXVJJE FILED, OFFENSE DATE 09/04/2021 | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 09/07/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 TR 008173 A | |
September 04, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED SEQ: 1 - (316.187(2A)) SPEED/70 INTERSTATE (REQUIRES SPEEDS) | |
September 04, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION ACXVJJE FILED, OFFENSE DATE 09/04/2021 |