Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
STATE OF FLORIDA vs. REYES CORDERO, NOE
A case was filed against Reyes Cordero, Noe, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. Judge MENZ, NICOLE presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 20, 2021
Last Refreshed
September 10, 2023
Filing Location
Indian River County, FL
Parties
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $113.00 RECEIPT #2021027655 | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - ADKN8NE | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - ADKN8NE | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE# 2021 TR 007849 A - SENTENCE IMPOSED: 8/24/2021 EFFECTIVE DATE: 8/24/2021 | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | PAID FINE SEQ: 1 | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF GUILTY SEQ 1 | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION ADKN8NE FILED, OFFENSE DATE 08/20/2021 | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : 30 DAYS TO PAY FINE REQUIRED BY: 09/19/2021 | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT INFORMATION SHEET | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | ADD SENT TO TCATS - ADKN8NE | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 08/23/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 TR 007849 A | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED SEQ: 1 - (316.183(2)) UNLAWFUL SPEED EXCESS POST 06-29 MILES OVER | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION ADKN8NE FILED, OFFENSE DATE 08/20/2021 |