Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
STATE OF FLORIDA vs. KALSBECK, ALBERT R JR
A case was filed against Kalsbeck, Albert R Jr, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. Judge STONE, ROBYN E. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 14, 2021
Last Refreshed
November 23, 2022
Filing Location
Indian River County, FL
Parties
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE REPORTED TO GILA CORP FOR COLLECTIONS, NEW TOTAL DUE $673.40 | |
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION ISSUED 04/18/2022 / LICENSE SUSPENDED - FAILED TO PAY $518.00 | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : FINES AND/OR COURT COSTS REQUIRED BY: 03/28/2022 | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT RECEIPT | |
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event | ADJUDICATED GUILTY SEQ: 1 | |
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event | PLEA FORM | |
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event | CHARGE CNT 1 SENTENCING NOTES: PNC; ADJ/G; TIME SERVED; $218 COURT COSTS; $25 COI; $100 COP; $50 PD APP FEE; $100 PD FEE; PAY OR ENTER A PAYMENT PLAN WITHIN 72 HOURS OF RELEASE; PD BARATTINI PRESENT. | |
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE# 2021 MM 001378 A - SENTENCE IMPOSED: 3/14/2022 EFFECTIVE DATE: 3/14/2022 | |
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF NOLO-CONTENDERE SEQ 1 | |
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 03/14/2022 AT 11:00 AM IN 2/ , JDG: STONE, ROBYN E. | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI; DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY; STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE / DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | PUBLIC DEFENDER GRANTED | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ATTORNEY: BARATTINI, MICHAEL ASSIGNED | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | INDIGENT CRIMINAL TRUST FUND - MM AND CT WAIVED $3.50 | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 03/15/2022 AT 8:30 AM IN 2/ , JDG: STONE, ROBYN E. | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE UNSECURED | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | FTA - ARREST AFFIDAVIT | |
February 12, 2022 | Docket Event | REARRESTED ON 02/12/2022: OBTS # 3101140881 | |
February 12, 2022 | Docket Event | BENCH WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SERVED | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | SURETY BOND U5-21240367 (810.09 2 M F 5707) UNESTREATED ON 02/11/2022 | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $500.00 RECEIPT #2022004670 | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | SURETY BOND U5-21240367 (810.09 2 M F 5707) RELEASED | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | SURETY BOND U5-21240367 (810.09 2 M F 5707) ESTREATED | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE OF BOND | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO MILANO BAIL BONDS RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312021MM001378AXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: CERTI-2/11/2022 | |
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | BENCH WARRANT ISSUED: | |
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312021MM001378AXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: CERT-12/22/2021 | |
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | BENCH WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO PENDING SIGNATURE | |
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE SECURED FOR ACTIVE PROCESS | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES: FTA - ISSUE BW | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | BENCH WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO PENDING SIGNATURE | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE SECURED FOR ACTIVE PROCESS | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FORFEITURE | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | SURETY BOND U5-21240367 (810.09 2 M F 5707) ESTREATED | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO MILANO BAIL BONDS RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312021MM001378AXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: NOF-12/7/2021 | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | SURETY BOND U5-21240367 POSTED $500.00 | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | FTA - ARREST AFFIDAVIT | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 12/07/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN 2/ , JDG: STONE, ROBYN E. | |
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | REARRESTED ON 11/03/2021: OBTS # 3101139498 | |
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | BENCH WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SERVED | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312021MM001378AXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: AA-9/14/2021 | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312021MM001378AXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: CERT-10/27/2021 | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES: FTA; ISSUE BENCH WARRANT; $500 BOND PER JUDGE | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | BENCH WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO PENDING SIGNATURE | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | BENCH WARRANT ISSUED: | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | BENCH WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SENT TO SHERIFF | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION FILED | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION FILED (ORIGINAL) | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | RELEASED ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 10/26/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN 2/ , JDG: STONE, ROBYN E. | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312021MM001378AXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: EFMO-10/4/2021 | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 10/07/2021 AT 11:00 AM IN 2/ , JDG: STONE, ROBYN E. | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER RELEASING DEFENDANT ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312021MM001378AXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: EFJDGORDER-10/5/2021 | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO RELEASE DEFENDANT ON HIS OWN RECOGNIZANCE | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | ARREST AFFIDAVIT | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 09/14/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 MM 001378 A | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | FIRST APPEARANCE ; BOND SET AT $500 | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 10/12/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN 2/ , JDG: STONE, ROBYN E. | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | ARREST SEQ: 1 - (810.09(2)) TRESPASS ON PROPERTY OTHER THAN STRUCTURE |