Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
STATE OF FLORIDA vs. TORRES, SCOTT MICHAEL
A case was filed against Torres, Scott Michael, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. Judge MENZ, NICOLE presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 20, 2021
Last Refreshed
November 19, 2022
Filing Location
Indian River County, FL
Parties
Defendants
Case Documents
CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE OF BOND
Date: Nov 09, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO 1A NIKI BAIL BONDS RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312021CT008406AXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: CERTI-4/29/2022 | |
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE OF BOND | |
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event | PARTIAL PAYMENT PLAN AGREEMENT | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | D6 ISSUED 03/07/2022 / LICENSE SUSPENDED - FAILED TO PAY $521.50 ADDITIONAL CLEARANCE FEE DUE | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | D-6 SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF NOLO-CONTENDERE SEQ 1 | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT RECEIPT | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE# 2021 CT 008406 A - SENTENCE IMPOSED: 1/6/2022 EFFECTIVE DATE: 1/6/2022 | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF NOLO-CONTENDERE SEQ 2 | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | CHARGE CNT 2 SENTENCING NOTES: PNC; ADJ/G; 30 DAYS CJ CTS CONC W/ ANY SENTENCE CURRENTLY SERVING. PD BARENBORG PRESENT. | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : FINES AND/OR COURT COSTS REQUIRED BY: 02/08/2022 | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | CHARGE CNT 1 SENTENCING NOTES: PNC; ADJ/G; 30 DAYS CJ CTS CONC W/ ANY SENTENCE CURRENTLY SERVING; $218 CRT COSTS; $25 COI; $100 COP; $100 PD FEE; $53.50 PD APP;PAY OR ENTER PMT PLAN WITHIN 72 HOURS OF RELEASE. PD BARENBORG PRESENT. | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT & SENTENCE - Recorded (OR.3500.519. / 3120220001161) | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | GUILTY SEQ: 1 | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | GUILTY SEQ: 2 | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AF1UK0E | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | SURETY BOND AA21-723859 (322.34 10B2 M F 600 5405) RELEASED | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AF1UJYE | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AF1UK0E | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AF1UJYE | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | SENTENCING SET FOR 01/06/2022 AT 8:30 AM IN 3/ , JDG: MENZ, NICOLE | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO 1A NIKI BAIL BONDS RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312021CT008406AXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: TNOH-12/30/2021 | |
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | PUBLIC DEFENDER GRANTED | |
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT FILLED OUT PD APPL TODAY, PD APPOINTED. PD WALSH PRESENT FOR PD BARRATTINI. PNC - SET FOR SENTENCING - DEFENSE MOTION FOR SENTENCING DATE TO ALLOW TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO TRY AND OBTAIN VALID DL. SET FOR 1-6-2022 AT 830 | |
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ATTORNEY: BARATTINI, MICHAEL ASSIGNED | |
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT RECEIPT | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | PENDING FELONY CASE #2020CF000813 >> POSSESSION OF BUPRENORPHINE >> USE / POSSESSION OF DRUG PARA SENTENCING SET FOR 01/06/2022 | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL: NO FURTHER ADDRESSS | |
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL CORRECTED ZIP CODE FROM PLEA FORM RESENT UPDATED NOTICE. | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES: (CT1 AND CT2) PNG; SET FOR JT 12/29/2021 AT 1:30 PM; DEFENDANT WILL HIRE TROY MCAFFE. | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO 1A NIKI BAIL BONDS RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312021CT008406AXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: TNOH-12/1/2021 | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | DOCKET CALL SET FOR 12/29/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN 3/ , JDG: MENZ, NICOLE | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | PLEA FORM | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT RECEIPT (CT1 AND CT2) | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES: CONTINUED ARRAIGNMENT TO 11/30/2021 AT 8:30AM; DEF TO HIRE OWN ATTY. | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT RECEIPT | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 11/30/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN 3/ , JDG: MENZ, NICOLE | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO 1A NIKI BAIL BONDS RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312021CT008406AXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: TNOH-11/16/2021 | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | PLEA FORM | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE OF BOND | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | SURETY BOND AA21717411 (322.34 10B2 M F 600 5405) ESTREATED | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | SURETY BOND AA21717411 (322.34 10B2 M F 600 5405) UNESTREATED ON 11/09/2021 | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | SURETY BOND AA21717412 (320.02 1 M S 5406) ESTREATED | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | SURETY BOND AA21717412 (320.02 1 M S 5406) UNESTREATED ON 11/09/2021 | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO 1A NIKI BAIL BONDS RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312021CT008406AXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: CERTI-11/9/2021 | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | SURETY BOND AA21-723859 POSTED $7,000.00 | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO 1A NIKI BAIL BONDS RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312021CT008406AXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: TNOH-10/27/2021 | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | FTA - ARREST AFFIDAVIT | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE UNSECURED | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 11/16/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN 3/ , JDG: MENZ, NICOLE | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | SURETY BOND AA21717412 (320.02 1 M S 5406) RELEASED | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | SURETY BOND AA21717411 (322.34 10B2 M F 600 5405) RELEASED | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | BENCH WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SERVED | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | REARRESTED ON 10/25/2021: OBTS # 3101139369 | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE SECURED FOR ACTIVE PROCESS | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312021CT008406AXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: CERT-10/20/2021 | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES: FTA D6 AND BW ISSUED | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FORFEITURE | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | SURETY BOND AA21717412 (320.02 1 M S 5406) ESTREATED | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | SURETY BOND AA21717411 (322.34 10B2 M F 600 5405) ESTREATED | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | BENCH WARRANT ISSUED: | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | BENCH WARRANT BOND AMOUNT SET TO $3000.00 | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | BENCH WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO PENDING SIGNATURE | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT RECEIPT | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | BENCH WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SENT TO SHERIFF | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 10/19/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN 3/ , JDG: MENZ, NICOLE | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT RECEIPT | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES: CONTINUED ARRAIGNMENT TO 10/19/2021 AT 8:30 AM; DEF TO TRY TO HIRE PRIVATE ATTY. | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | PLEA FORM | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | DL RECORD | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | PENDING CASE: 2020CF813 SET FOR TRIAL 11/1/21 - POSSESSION OF BUPRENORPHINE - USE OR POSSESSION OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AF1UK0E | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING TRANSFER FROM FELONY | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION - DOWNFILE TO COUNTY COURT - REF #31-2021-CF-000990-A (ORIGINAL) | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 10/05/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN 3/ , JDG: MENZ, NICOLE | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY TAYLOR, CHRISTOPHER DEACTIVATED | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO 1A NIKI BAIL BONDS RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312021CT008406AXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: NOHT-9/15/2021 | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION AF1UK0E FILED, OFFENSE DATE 08/20/2021 | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: TAYLOR, CHRISTOPHER ASSIGNED | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE HAS BEEN TRANSFERRED FROM 2021 CF 000990 A | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION - DOWNFILE TO COUNTY COURT - REF #31-2021-CF-000990-A (ORIGINAL) | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION AF1UJYE FILED, OFFENSE DATE 08/20/2021 | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AF1UJYE | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AF1UK0E | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION AF1UJYE FILED, OFFENSE DATE 08/20/2021 | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | ADD SENT TO TCATS - AF1UJYE | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | ADD SENT TO TCATS - AF1UK0E | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION AF1UK0E FILED, OFFENSE DATE 08/20/2021 | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | ARREST AFFIDAVIT | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | SURETY BOND AA21717412 POSTED $500.00 | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 10/01/2021 AT 8:45 AM IN 5/ , JDG: VAUGHN, DAN | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | FIRST APPEARANCE | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | ARREST SEQ: 1 - (322.34(5)) DRIVE WHILE LIC SUSP HABITUAL OFFENDER | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | ARREST SEQ: 2 - (320.02(1)) FAIL TO REGISTER MOTOR VEH |