Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
BRENN, JAMES vs. SKAGGS, KAREN
On July 31, 2014 an eviction non-monetary (count i) - residential case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. Judge WILD, JOE A presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 31, 2014
Last Refreshed
January 08, 2022
Filing Location
Indian River County, FL
Judge
Category
Eviction Non-Monetary (Count I) - Residential
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Landlord-Tenant
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2014 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTES **SUSPENSE CK #0368654 FOR $8.00 M/TO PLF FOR OVERPAYMENT** | |
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISS'D (ORIGINAL TO PLF @ FRNT CNTR, COPY IN FILE) | |
August 18, 2014 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION - Recorded (OR.2783.705. / 3120140049866) | |
August 18, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 18, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY COURT ( KAREN SKAGGS, TRACI HADDEN & KELSI HADDEN) -NOT SIGNED BY JUDGE | |
August 13, 2014 | Docket Event | CLERKS DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST (KAREN SKAGGS AND TRACI HADDEN AND KELSI HADDEN) | |
August 08, 2014 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE (KAREN SKAGGS - SVD: 8/4/14) | |
August 06, 2014 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SVD:8/5/14 (KELSI HADDEN) | |
August 06, 2014 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SVD:8/5/14 (TRACI HADDEN) | |
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS STATUS CHANGED TO SERVED | |
August 04, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS STATUS CHANGED TO SERVED | |
August 01, 2014 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $230.00 RECEIPT #2014034004 | |
July 31, 2014 | Docket Event | **M/COURT DEFAULT/FJ/WRIT STAPLED INSIDE FOLDER** | |
July 31, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS STATUS CHANGED TO PENDING SUMMONS | |
July 31, 2014 | Docket Event | **DEFAULT CANNOT BE ENTERED AT THIS TIME - FOR CLERK FOLLOW-UP** | |
July 31, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK (AGAINST KAREN SKAGGS, TRACI HADDEN AND KELSI HADDEN) | |
July 31, 2014 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
July 31, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED: KELSI HADDEN (5 DAY) | |
July 31, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 07/31/2014 CASE NUMBER 2014 CC 001142 | |
July 31, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED: KIAREN SKAGGS (5 DAY) | |
July 31, 2014 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT (COUNT I) | |
July 31, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED: TRACI HADDEN (5 DAY) | |
July 31, 2014 | Docket Event | EVICTION CERTIFICATE OF MAILING |