Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
STATE OF FLORIDA vs. DELACRUZ, LORENZO
A case was filed against Delacruz, Lorenzo, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. Judge STONE, ROBYN E. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 27, 2006
Last Refreshed
January 07, 2022
Filing Location
Indian River County, FL
Judge
Practice Area
Criminal
Matter Type
Criminal Related (Civil)
Status
Active
Parties
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2007 | Docket Event | COLLECT ADDITIONAL 40% ON FINE. | |
December 12, 2006 | Docket Event | DL6 ISSUED $133.50 | |
November 05, 2006 | Docket Event | 316.089 FAILD TO USE DESIGNATED LANE, FAIL TO DR | |
October 03, 2006 | Docket Event | DL6 CT 01 |