Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC vs. TANKERSLEY, DONALD L
On August 21, 2006 a delinquent acct. under $5000.00 case was filed by Asset Acceptance Llc, against Tankersley, Donald L, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. Judge WILD, JOE A presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 21, 2006
Last Refreshed
January 15, 2022
Filing Location
Indian River County, FL
Judge
Category
DELINQUENT ACCT. UNDER $5000.00
Practice Area
Small Claims
Matter Type
General Small Claims
Status
Default Judgment
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event | ***** FILE DESTROYED ***** | |
March 29, 2007 | Docket Event | ***WARRANT REQUEST TO GLORIA 04/11/07 FOR $100.00 | |
March 29, 2007 | Docket Event | MAILED 04/16/07 RTN: SGN: | |
March 29, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR REFUND OF | |
March 29, 2007 | Docket Event | ***CHECK #0342980 FOR $100.00 PAYABLE TO ATTY MIRO | |
March 29, 2007 | Docket Event | PAYABLE TO PLF ATTY***TEC | |
March 29, 2007 | Docket Event | ***RELEASE MONIES 04/10/07***TEC | |
March 29, 2007 | Docket Event | GARNISHMENT DEPOSIT /S/JW 03/29/07 | |
March 28, 2007 | Docket Event | INC.) ORBK: 2905 PG: 668 | |
March 28, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISSOLUTION OF THE CONTINUING | |
March 28, 2007 | Docket Event | WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (GARN:CULPEPPER & TERPENING, | |
March 23, 2007 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR REFUND OF GARNISHMENT DEPOSIT | |
March 23, 2007 | Docket Event | **FILE TO JW 3/28 W/ORDER** RTN:03/29/07 | |
January 26, 2007 | Docket Event | FIRST NOTICE TO DEFENDANT | |
January 11, 2007 | Docket Event | (GARN: CULPEPPER & TERPENING INC) | |
January 11, 2007 | Docket Event | CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT /S/JW 1/8/06 | |
January 11, 2007 | Docket Event | RTN: 2/1/07 SVD: 1/26/07 | |
January 11, 2007 | Docket Event | (ORIG/2 CF W/NOTICE, CLAIM, ANS M/ATY; COPY FILE) | |
January 05, 2007 | Docket Event | RECEIPT # 200701080890008, PAYMENT $75.00 | |
January 05, 2007 | Docket Event | ***DEPOSITED $100 IN REGISTRY R#200701080890007 | |
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event | (GARN: CULPEPPER & TERPENING INC) | |
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT | |
November 01, 2006 | Docket Event | DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT /S/JW-103106 ($1,237.30) ORBK: 2097 PG: 2415 | |
October 19, 2006 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM (DISPOSED BY DEFAULT) | |
October 19, 2006 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE | |
September 14, 2006 | Docket Event | **PLF PRESENT DFT NO SERVICE IF RETURN SHOWS SERVICE | |
September 14, 2006 | Docket Event | BEFORE PTC ISSUE DFJ** | |
August 23, 2006 | Docket Event | RECEIPT # 200608230910022, PAYMENT $155.00 | |
August 22, 2006 | Docket Event | SUMS ISSD (DONALD L TANKERSLEY) PS:ACCESS | |
August 22, 2006 | Docket Event | (C:ATTY VIA PS) RTN:9/13/06 SVD:9/9/06 | |
August 21, 2006 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
August 21, 2006 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT |