Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
STATE OF FLORIDA vs. SCOTT, JEFFERY
A case was filed against Scott, Jeffery, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. Judge VAUGHN, DAN presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 31, 2005
Last Refreshed
January 07, 2022
Filing Location
Indian River County, FL
Practice Area
Criminal
Matter Type
General Criminal
Status
Closed
Parties
Defendants
Case Documents
JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE
Date: Mar 29, 2006Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $832.00 RECEIPT #2020029071 | |
October 12, 2020 | Docket Event | FLORIDA RIGHTS RESTORATION COALITION PAID THE PRINCIPAL $832.00 - -- - - DEFENDANT STILL OWES THE INTEREST AND SATISFACTION FEES | |
October 05, 2015 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTES: MONEY RECIEVED - SENT REQUEST DOCUMENTS OUT TODAY | |
October 05, 2015 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $10.98 RECEIPT #2015041328 | |
March 24, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST FROM SHERIFF WASHINGTON FOR DOCUMENTS- CALLED AND LEFT MESSAGE ($10.98 COST W/POSTAGE FOR INFO/AFFIDAVIT/DISPO) | |
February 07, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR CERTIFIED DOCUMENTS FROM PIERCE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPT, WASHINGTON. PHONED REQUESTOR TO ADVISE OF COST PER PAGE AND CERTIFYING DOCUMENTS. NO ANSWER - LEFT VOICE MAIL. REQUESTOR HAS NOT RETURNED CALL. | |
August 15, 2011 | Docket Event | STATE (FT PIERCE) REQUEST FOR CERTIFIED CONVICTION- SENT TODAY | |
March 29, 2006 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE | |
March 29, 2006 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES, COSTS & ADDL CHARGES (832.00) | |
March 24, 2006 | Docket Event | COUNT 2 ADJ. G.-(F), 1 YR IRCJ, 84 DAYS CTS, **DNA SWAB | |
March 24, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDERED, $50 COI TO IRCSO, FEES/COSTS REDUCED TO CIVIL LIEN. | |
March 24, 2006 | Docket Event | GUIDELINE SENTENCING SCORESHEET | |
March 24, 2006 | Docket Event | CHANGE OF PLEA, PNC AS CHARGED | |
March 24, 2006 | Docket Event | PLEA FORM | |
March 24, 2006 | Docket Event | COMMITMENT FORM | |
March 17, 2006 | Docket Event | SET FOR MOTIONS (CHANGE OF PLEA) 3/24/06 @ 8:30AM | |
March 17, 2006 | Docket Event | SA/ DA AGREE TO CONTINUE CHANGE OF PLEA | |
March 17, 2006 | Docket Event | SET FOR DOCKET CALL ON 12/31/2006 AT 07:30 | |
March 15, 2006 | Docket Event | PER J.A.,SET FOR 3/21/06 @ 8:30AM (M/REDUCE BOND) | |
March 07, 2006 | Docket Event | SET FOR DOCKET CALL ON 12/31/2006 AT 07:30 (TRACKING) | |
March 07, 2006 | Docket Event | SET FOR CHANGE OF PLEA 3/17/06 @ 8:30AM (MOTIONS) | |
March 06, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF LEO (2) | |
March 06, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
March 02, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING RE: M/FOR BOND REDUCTION 3/21/06 @ 8:30 | |
March 02, 2006 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION | |
February 27, 2006 | Docket Event | DEFENSE DISCOVERY EXHIBIT | |
February 24, 2006 | Docket Event | STATES DISC EXHIBIT,DEMAND RECIP DISC, DEMAND NOTICE ALIBI | |
February 22, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO BONDSMAN 02/22/2006 | |
February 06, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND DEMAND FOR BRADY MATERIAL | |
February 06, 2006 | Docket Event | WRITTEN PLEA NOT GUILTY | |
February 06, 2006 | Docket Event | SET FOR DOCKET CALL ON 03/07/2006 AT 08:45 | |
January 31, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO BONDSMAN 01/31/2006 | |
January 30, 2006 | Docket Event | SET FOR ARRAIGNMENT ON 02/10/2006 AT 08:45 | |
January 30, 2006 | Docket Event | TRANSFERRED FROM 200502050 ON 01/30/2006 | |
January 27, 2006 | Docket Event | INFORMATION (ASA JASON BRUIN) | |
January 06, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PD HIXSON) | |
January 05, 2006 | Docket Event | APP FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS APPROVED BY EXAMINER | |
January 03, 2006 | Docket Event | ARREST AFFIDAVIT (ORIGINAL) | |
January 03, 2006 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS - TO EXAMINER | |
December 31, 2005 | Docket Event | ARREST AFFIDAVIT (COPY) | |
December 31, 2005 | Docket Event | FIRST APPEARANCE (NO CONTACT WITH VICTIM, B.P.) | |
December 31, 2005 | Docket Event | SET FOR ARRAIGNMENT ON 02/10/2006 AT 08:45 |