Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
OLD DOMINION INSURANCE COMPANY VS LEON; CYNTHIA
On March 18, 1987 a reentered civil action case was filed by Old Dominion Insurance Company, against Leon, Cynthia, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL. Judge Judge, Not. Assigned presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 18, 1987
Last Refreshed
January 10, 2024
Filing Location
Hillsborough County, FL
Judge
Hon. Judge, Not. Assigned
Category
Civil
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Judge, Not. Assigned |
|
November 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=CUSHMAN Judge: Judge, Not. Assigned |
|
November 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT DDETL - CASE DETAIL INFORMATION. AUTO NEGLIGENCE DIVISION O. USER ID=BELLAMY Judge: Judge, Not. Assigned |
|
November 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT DRECA - DOCKET REENTERED CIVIL ACTION. USER ID=BELLAMY Judge: Judge, Not. Assigned |
|
May 28, 1987 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT U428 - WRIT OF GARNISHMENT RET SERVED. FLORIDA LAND DESIGN & ENGINEERING, INC 05/26/1987. USER ID=BELLAMY Judge: Judge, Not. Assigned |
|
May 14, 1987 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT U427 - WRIT OF GRNSHMNT RET'D NOT SRV. GARNISHEE-FLORIDA LAND DESIGN & ENGINEERING, INC. USER ID=BELLAMY Judge: Judge, Not. Assigned |
|
May 10, 1987 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT U426 - WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED. MOTION. USER ID=BELLAMY Judge: Judge, Not. Assigned |
|
May 07, 1987 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT U426 - WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED. MOTION. USER ID=BELLAMY Judge: Judge, Not. Assigned |
|
April 22, 1987 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT U540 - FINAL DISPOSITION FORM. USER ID=BELLAMY Judge: Judge, Not. Assigned |
|
April 22, 1987 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT U16 - AFFIDAVIT OF. R. FREFERICK MELIN. USER ID=BELLAMY Judge: Judge, Not. Assigned |
|
April 22, 1987 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT U54 - FINAL JUDGMENT. ON DEFAULT 04/22/1987 RWR JR OR 5101 PG 101. USER ID=BELLAMY Judge: Judge, Not. Assigned |
|
April 22, 1987 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT U175 - LETTER TO COURT FROM. R. FREFERICK MELIN-HAND DELIVERED. USER ID=BELLAMY Judge: Judge, Not. Assigned |
|
April 22, 1987 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT U16 - AFFIDAVIT OF. FRANK VACANTI. USER ID=BELLAMY Judge: Judge, Not. Assigned |
|
April 15, 1987 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT U73 - MOTION FOR & DEFAULT ENTERED. CYNTHIA LEON 04/15/1987. USER ID=BELLAMY Judge: Judge, Not. Assigned |
|
March 24, 1987 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT U65 - SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON. CYNTHIA LEON. USER ID=BELLAMY Judge: Judge, Not. Assigned |
|
March 18, 1987 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT U3 - COMPLAINT FILED SUMMONS ISSUED. USER ID=BELLAMY Judge: Judge, Not. Assigned |
|
March 18, 1987 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT U539 - CIVIL COVER SHEET. USER ID=BELLAMY Judge: Judge, Not. Assigned |